This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 08:28:05 (UTC).

Missed Call, LLC v. Talkdesk, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Missed Call, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Talkdesk, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00740

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Missed Call, LLC

Defendant

Talkdesk, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

William P. Ramey, III

Defendant Attorneys

Elena C. Norman

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Robert M. Vrana

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Related Cases

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,531,872. (twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Missed Call, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Talkdesk, Inc. on 6/6/2022. (twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Missed Call, LLC. Talkdesk, Inc. served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 08/14/2022 - filed by Missed Call, LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William P Ramey, III - filed by Missed Call, LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Elena C. Norman on behalf of Talkdesk, Inc. (Norman, Elena) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Vrana on behalf of Talkdesk, Inc. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Vrana on behalf of Talkdesk, Inc. (Vrana, Robert) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Elena C. Norman on behalf of Talkdesk, Inc. (Norman, Elena) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney William P. Ramey, III for Missed Call, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:22-cv-00739-CFC) (8 in 1:22-cv-00740-CFC) LLC, (8 in 1:22-cv-00742-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William P Ramey, III, filed by Missed Call, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/19/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00742-CFC, 1:22-cv-00739-CFC, 1:22-cv-00740-CFC(kmd) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William P Ramey, III - filed by Missed Call, LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 08/14/2022, filed by Missed Call, LLC. Reset Answer Deadlines: Talkdesk, Inc. answer due 8/14/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/30/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 08/14/2022 - filed by Missed Call, LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Missed Call, LLC. Talkdesk, Inc. served on 6/9/2022, answer due 6/30/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00739-CFC, 1:22-cv-00740-CFC, 1:22-cv-00742-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Talkdesk, Inc. on 6/6/2022. (twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Missed Call, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,531,872. (twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Talkdesk, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3889745.) - filed by Missed Call, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Talkdesk, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elena C. Norman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert M. Vrana