This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 08:27:56 (UTC).

Missed Call, LLC v. Freshworks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Missed Call, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Freshworks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00739

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Missed Call, LLC

Defendant

Freshworks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

William P. Ramey, III

Defendant Attorneys

John C. Phillips, Jr.

Attorney at Phillips, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 N. Broom St

Wilmington, DE 19806

David A. Bilson

Attorney at Phillips, Goldman, McLaughlin & Hall, P.A.

1200 North Broom Street

Wilmington, DE 19806

Rex A. Mann

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Certification of Rex A. Mann

12 #1

Certification of Krishnan Padmanabhan

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Freshworks, Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

10 #2

Certification of Compliance

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William P Ramey, III - filed by Missed Call, LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 29, 2022 - filed by Freshworks, Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Missed Call, LLC. Freshworks, Inc. served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Freshworks, Inc. on 6/6/2022. (apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Missed Call, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,531,872. (apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Rex A. Mann for Freshworks, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan and Rex A. Mann, filed by Freshworks, Inc. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/29/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Krishnan Padmanabhan and Rex A. Mann - filed by Freshworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Krishnan Padmanabhan, #2 Certification of Rex A. Mann)(Bilson, David) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Freshworks, Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Lack of Patent-Eligible Subject Matter filed by Freshworks, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certification of Compliance)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim for Lack of Patent-Eligible Subject Matter - filed by Freshworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, John) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney William P. Ramey, III for Missed Call, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mpb) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (8 in 1:22-cv-00739-CFC) (8 in 1:22-cv-00740-CFC) LLC, (8 in 1:22-cv-00742-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William P Ramey, III, filed by Missed Call, LLC. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/19/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00742-CFC, 1:22-cv-00739-CFC, 1:22-cv-00740-CFC(kmd) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William P Ramey, III - filed by Missed Call, LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 29, 2022, filed by Freshworks, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Freshworks, Inc. answer due 7/29/2022. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/28/2022. (kmd) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 29, 2022 - filed by Freshworks, Inc.. (Phillips, John) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Missed Call, LLC. Freshworks, Inc. served on 6/8/2022, answer due 6/29/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00739-CFC, 1:22-cv-00740-CFC, 1:22-cv-00742-CFC (rjb) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Freshworks, Inc. on 6/6/2022. (apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Missed Call, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,531,872. (apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Freshworks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3889680.) - filed by Missed Call, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 List of Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Freshworks LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rex Andrew Mann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Bilson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C. Phillips, Jr.