This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2020 at 10:49:43 (UTC).

Misner et al v. Asa Griego Deliveries LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Misner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Asa Griego Deliveries LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are William J. Martinez and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01885

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda Tecumseh

Neil Misner

Defendants

Centennial Automotive, LLC

Kemper Corporation

Asa Griego Deliveries LLC

Elite Logistics, Inc.

Marc A. Guerrero

Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William C. Doutt

Attorney at Hadfield Stieben & Doutt LLC

215 West Magnolia Street, Suite 201

Fort Collins, CO 80521

Gordon Michael Hadfield

Attorney at Hadfield Stieben & Doutt LLC

215 West Magnolia Street, Suite 201

Fort Collins, CO 80521

Andrew William Callahan

Attorney at Wick & Trautwein LLC

323 South College Avenue, Suite 3

Fort Collins, CO 80524

Defendant Attorneys

Warren N. Eckloff, III

Attorney at Montgomery Little & Soran, P.C.

5445 Dtc Parkway, Suite 800

Greenwood Village, CO 80111-3053

John Robert Riley

Attorney at Montgomery Little & Soran, P.C.

5445 Dtc Parkway, Suite 800

Greenwood Village, CO 80111-3053

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii, Suite 300

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Brendan Forrest Friedman

Attorney at Lasater & Martin PC

8822 South Ridgeline Boulevard, Suite 405

Highlands Ranch, CO 80129

J. Scott Lasater

Attorney at Lasater & Martin PC

8822 South Ridgeline Boulevard, Suite 405

Highlands Ranch, CO 80129

 

Court Documents

#54

#53

#52

#51

#50

#46

44 #1

Exhibit 1 - Colorado State Patrol Report

#44

#39

1 #11

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Party Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company terminated pursuant to #54 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed in this case on 8/14/2020. Text Only Entry (angar, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company by Defendant Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) RESPONSE to #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Centennial Automotive LLC filed by Plaintiff Neil Misner. (Callahan, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) RESPONSE to #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elite Logistic, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Neil Misner. (Callahan, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) REPLY to Response to #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiffs Neil Misner, Linda Tecumseh. (Doutt, William) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Auto Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent AN Dealership Holding Corp., Corporate Parent AutoNation, Inc., Corporate Parent AutoNation Enterprises Incorporated for Centennial Automotive, LLC. (Riley, John) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) RESPONSE to #44 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Defendants Asa Griego Deliveries LLC and Marc Guerrero's ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand by Asa Griego Deliveries LLC, Marc A. Guerrero.(Friedman, Brendan) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand #44 . Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Response to the Motion on or before August 5, 2020. Plaintiffs shall file a Reply on or before August 12, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/28/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Elite Logistics, Inc.. (Friedman, Brendan) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil Summons; Complaint and Jury Demand and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Marc A. Guerrero on 06/14/2020 (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil Summons; Complaint and Jury Demand and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Elite Logistics on 05/29/2020 (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil Summons; Complaint and Jury Demand and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Centennial Automotive on 05/27/2020 (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Civil Summons; Complaint and Jury Demand and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon ASA Griego Deliveries, LLC on 06/03/2020 (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF PROCESS SERVER of Summons, Civil Complaint & Case Cover Sheet upon Kemper Corporation on 05/26/2020 (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of District Court Cibil Summons; Complaint and Jury Demand and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company on 05/27/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Asa Griego Deliveries LLC, Centennial Automotive, LLC, Elite Logistics, Inc., Marc A. Guerrero, Kemper Corporation, filed by Linda Tecumseh, Neil Misner.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendants Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Kemper Corporation. (Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kemper Corporation, Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company from Larimer District, Case Number 2020cv30348. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7359042), filed by Kemper Corporation, Alpha Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELITE LOGISTICS CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Kemper Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPHA PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William C Doutt