This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 08:39:34 (UTC).

Mismanagement, Inc. et al v. Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Mismanagement, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08123

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

MISMANAGEMENT, INC., a California corporation

DAVID MARGERESON

Mismanagement, Inc.

Roes

Defendants and Counter Claimants

CHARLES ROGER POMFRET HODGSON, a/k/a ROGER HODGSON

ROGER HODGSON PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation

DELICATE MUSIC, a California general partnership

RICK DAVIES PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation

RICHARD DAVIES

UNIVERSAL MUSIC CORP., a Delaware Corporation, d/b/a UNIVERSAL MUSIC PUBLISHING GROUP

THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF COMPOSERS, AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS, a New York not-for-profit performing rights organization

Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson

Roger Hodgson

Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc.

Delicate Music

Rick Davies Productions, Inc.

Universal Music Corp. a Delaware Corporation doing business as Universal Music Publishing Group

The American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers

Does 1-20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth D Freundlich

Attorney at Freundlich Law

16133 Ventura Boulevard Suite 645

Encino, CA 91436

Michael Jason Kaiser

Attorney at Freundlich Law

16133 Ventura Boulevard Suite 645

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Michael J Plonsker

Attorney at Plonsker Law LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Rex Daniel Glensy

Attorney at Plonsker Law LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 700

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Robert A Jacobs

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sarah Emily Moses

Attorney at Manatt Phelps and Phillips LLP

2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Aaron P Allan

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Fred D Heather

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Jacobs Howard Avchen and Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

31 #1

Proposed Order

31 #31

Main Document

#30

(#30) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS ROGER HODGSON, ROGER HODGSON PRODUCTIONS, INC., AND DELICATE MUSIC TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #28 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following filing deadlines shall apply to this matter: 1. The deadline for Defendants Roger Hodgson and Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc., to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to December 17, 2021; and 2. The deadline for Defendant Delicate Music to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to December 17, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#29

(#29) ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiffs and Counterdefendants David Margereson, Mismanagement, Inc..(Attorney Kenneth D Freundlich added to party David Margereson(pty:cd), Attorney Kenneth D Freundlich added to party Mismanagement, Inc.(pty:cd))(Freundlich, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

28 #2

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation To Extend Time For De

28 #1

Declaration Declaration Of Robert A. Jacobs In Support Of Joint Stipulation To E

28 #28

Main Document

26 #2

Exhibit B

26 #26

Main Document

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:21-cv-08759-AB-PLA filed by Plaintiffs and Counterdefendants David Margereson, Mismanagement, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kaiser, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS ROGER HODGSON, ROGER HODGSON PRODUCTIONS, INC., AND DELICATE MUSIC TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #28 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following filing deadlines shall apply to this matter: 1. The deadline for Defendants Roger Hodgson and Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc., to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to December 17, 2021; and 2. The deadline for Defendant Delicate Music to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to December 17, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to Counterclaim, filed by Plaintiffs and Counterdefendants David Margereson, Mismanagement, Inc..(Attorney Kenneth D Freundlich added to party David Margereson(pty:cd), Attorney Kenneth D Freundlich added to party Mismanagement, Inc.(pty:cd))(Freundlich, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 12/17/2021 re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson, Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Robert A. Jacobs In Support Of Joint Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants Roger Hodgson, Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc., And Delicate Music To Respond To Initial Complaint, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendants Roger Hodgson, Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc., And Delicate Music To Respond To Initial Complaint)(Jacobs, Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Amended Complaint. Other error(s) with document(s): Notice of Removal is an Initial Pleading. If amending the Notice of Removal, the correct event to use is amending the complaint. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C.1653; REMOVAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1441(a) (FEDERAL QUESTION) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Plonsker, Michael) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson answer now due 11/19/2021; Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc. answer now due 11/19/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson; Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc..(Jacobs, Robert) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND COUNTER DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-COMPLAINT BY 21 DAYS by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #23 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Counterdefendants Mismanagement, Inc., and David Margereson's deadline to respond to Counterclaimant Richard Davies' Cross-Complaint is extended to no later than 11/18/2021. (gk) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 11/18/2021 re Counterclaim, filed by Counterdefendants David Margereson, Mismanagement, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Michael Jason Kaiser added to party David Margereson(pty:cd), Attorney Michael Jason Kaiser added to party Mismanagement, Inc.(pty:cd))(Kaiser, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE filed by Defendants Richard Davies, Rick Davies Productions, Inc.. OF NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Plonsker, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert A Jacobs counsel for Defendants Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson, Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc.. Adding Robert A. Jacobs as counsel of record for Defendants Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson, a/k/a Roger Hodgson and Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson, a/k/a Roger Hodgson and Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc.. (Attorney Robert A Jacobs added to party Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Jacobs added to party Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jacobs, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COUNTERCLAIM (FILED AS CROSS-COMPLAINT IN STATE COURT) against Counter Defendants David Margereson, Roes 1-50, inclusive, Mismanagement, Inc.; Jury Demanded, filed by Richard Davies. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D) (ghap) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Richard Davies, Rick Davies Productions, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/7/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT C)(ghap) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Richard Davies, Delicate Music, Does 1-20, inclusive Charles Roger Pomfret Hodgson, Rick Davies Productions, Inc., Roger Hodgson Productions, Inc., The American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers, Universal Music Corp. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs David Margereson, Mismanagement, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by RICHARD DAVIES, RICK DAVIES PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation. (Plonsker, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants RICHARD DAVIES, RICK DAVIES PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation, identifying DAVID CAMPBELL THOMSON; JOHN ANTHONY HELLIWELL; ROBERT LAYNE SIEBENBERG. (Plonsker, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants RICHARD DAVIES, RICK DAVIES PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation.. (Plonsker, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens filed by Defendants RICHARD DAVIES, RICK DAVIES PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation. (Plonsker, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants RICHARD DAVIES, RICK DAVIES PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation. (Plonsker, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV25978 Receipt No: ACACDC-32139569 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants RICK DAVIES PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation, RICHARD DAVIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Michael J Plonsker added to party RICHARD DAVIES(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J Plonsker added to party RICK DAVIES PRODUCTIONS, INC., a California corporation(pty:dft))(Plonsker, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MISMANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP INC. is a litigant