This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2023 at 08:16:56 (UTC).

Miser et al v. Centurion of Arizona LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 Miser filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Centurion of Arizona LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01968

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Miser

Shirley Miser

Defendants

Centurion of Arizona LLC

Unknown Delany

Unknown Parties

Joni Delaney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark A Ryan

Attorney at Zwillinger Wulkan PLC

2020 N Central Ave., Ste. 675

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Scott H Zwillinger

Attorney at Zwillinger Wulkan PLC

2020 N Central Ave., Ste. 675

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Lynn Barnes

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak

Attorney at Broening Oberg Woods & Wilson PC - Phoenix, AZ

2800 N Central Ave., Ste. 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE re: Notice of Service by James Miser, Shirley Miser re: #15 Order, . (Zwillinger, Scott) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER This matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 12/29/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendant Centurion of Arizona's #10 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs shall have until January 20, 2023 to file their Response to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 12/27/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) Joinder re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Unknown Delany. (Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak on behalf of Unknown Delany(named as Doe Delany, a married couple). (Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting Defendant's Second Unopposed #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until 12/6/2022 to file their responsive brief to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 12/2/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

8 #1

Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit A

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed #4 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendant shall have until December 1, 2022 to file their responsive brief to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 11/28/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE re: Notice of Service by James Miser, Shirley Miser re: #15 Order, . (Zwillinger, Scott) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER This matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings and are ordered as follows. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 12/29/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendant Centurion of Arizona's #10 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs shall have until January 20, 2023 to file their Response to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 12/27/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) *Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by James Miser, Shirley Miser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Zwillinger, Scott) *Modified to correct event on 12/20/2022 (KJ). (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joinder re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Unknown Delany. (Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kirstin Michelle Dvorchak on behalf of Unknown Delany(named as Doe Delany, a married couple). (Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting Defendant's Second Unopposed #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall have until 12/6/2022 to file their responsive brief to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 12/2/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE re: Amended Notice of Removal by Centurion of Arizona LLC re: #1 Notice of Removal, #6 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting Defendant's Unopposed #4 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendant shall have until December 1, 2022 to file their responsive brief to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 11/28/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting leave for Defendants to file a Notice of Removal in compliance with LRCiv 3.6(a) within five days (5) of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Defendants fail to file a Notice of Removal in compliance with LRCiv 3.6(a) within five days (5) of the date of this Order, this case will be remanded without further notice. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 11/28/2022. (ESG) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21327675. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-22-1968-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Dvorchak, Kirstin) (JAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2022-013826. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21327675 filed by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Dvorchak, Kirstin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(JAM) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less