This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2020 at 07:19:58 (UTC).

Mirza et al v. Amar

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 Mirza filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Amar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02699

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC

Dr. Muhammad Mirza

Defendant

Alia Salman Amar

Brooklyn, NY 11230

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David D. Lin

Attorney at Lewis & Lin, LLC

81 Prospect Street, Suite 8001

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza. (Lin, David) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Alia Salman Amar. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza (Lin, David) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 7/30/2020 at 1:00 pm and will be held by telephone. Parties are directed to use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877#. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/18/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) Modified on 7/22/2020 (Weisberg, Peggy). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alia Salman Amar filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-12942074 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Muhammad Mirza, Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lin, David) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 . Telephone conference adjourned to 8/27/2020 at 10:00 am. Parties are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the initial status conference set forth at #4 and are further directed to file on ECF a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/28/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza. (Lin, David) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Alia Salman Amar. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza (Lin, David) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 7/30/2020 at 1:00 pm and will be held by telephone. Parties are directed to use the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877#. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/18/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) Modified on 7/22/2020 (Weisberg, Peggy). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alia Salman Amar filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-12942074 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Muhammad Mirza, Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lin, David) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less