This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 07:54:44 (UTC).

Miramontez v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Miramontez filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Phyllis J. Hamilton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01762

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Phyllis J. Hamilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Helen Miramontez

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonas Palmer Mann

Attorney at Baron & Budd, P.C.

15910 Ventura Blvd., Ste. 1600

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorney

Joshua James Wes

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

515 South Flower Street, Forty Second Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Helen Miramontez (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 4/30/2021) Modified on 5/3/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER TO PERMIT FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #11 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 4/30/2021. Response to Amended Pleadings due 5/31/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO PERMIT FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #1 Complaint, filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wes, Joshua) (Filed on 4/13/2021) Modified on 4/14/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/9/2021. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 4/9/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Helen Miramontez.. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 4/21/2021. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Helen Miramontez. Service waived by Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 3/15/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Helen Miramontez. Service waived by Ethicon, Inc. waiver sent on 3/15/2021, answer due 5/14/2021. (Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/29/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15695786). Filed by Helen Miramontez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mann, Jonas) (Filed on 3/12/2021) Modified on 3/15/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonas P Mann