This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2022 at 11:39:53 (UTC).

Miramax, LLC v. Quentin Tarantino et al

Case Summary

On November 16, 2021, Miramax, LLC (“Plaintiff”), represented by Bart H. Williams and Kyle Alexander Casazza of Proskauer Rose LLP, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against  Quentin Tarantino and Visiona Romantica, Inc (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief, damages and other reliefs for the Defendants’ alleged copyright infringement. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Central District of California with Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Judge Jacqueline Chooljian presiding.

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint in order to enforce, preserve, and protect its contractual and intellectual property rights relating to one of Miramax’s film properties. 

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Pursuant to the Original Rights Agreement and the subsequent Tarantino-Miramax Assignment, Tarantino, in exchange for valuable consideration, granted and assigned to Miramax in perpetuity throughout the universe, “all rights (including all copyrights and trademarks) in and to the Film (and all elements thereof in all stages of development and production) now or hereafter know including without limitation the right to distribute the Film in all media now or hereafter known (theatrical, non-theatrical, all forms of television, home video, etc.),” excluding only a limited set of Tarantino’s “Reserved Rights.””

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Those grants and assignments prohibit Defendants from exploiting or licensing those same rights to develop and sell the Pulp Fiction NFTs. Miramax has been damaged and will continue to sustain damages from Defendants’ exploitation of rights to Pulp Fiction that belong to Miramax. Defendants’ conduct in connection with the development and sale of the Pulp Fiction NFTs is a substantial factor in causing Miramax’s harm.” 

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Through Defendants’ conduct alleged herein, including Defendants’ sale of rights relating to Pulp Fiction, and preparation and reproduction of derivative works based on Pulp Fiction without Miramax’s permission, Defendants have directly infringed Miramax’s exclusive rights in Pulp Fiction and the elements thereof in violation of Section 501 of the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. § 501. Defendants’ infringing conduct alleged herein was and continues to be willful and with full knowledge of Miramax’s rights relating to Pulp Fiction, and has enabled Defendants illegally to obtain profit therefrom.”   

 

There are four claims for relief laid down by Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for breach of contract. The second claim alleged is for copyright infringement under 17 U.S.C. § 501. The third claim alleged is for trademark infringement under 15 U.S.C. § 1114 and the fourth claim is for unfair competition under 15 U.S.C. § 1125(a). 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for damages in an amount to be determined at trial, or at Miramax’s election; declaratory relief that Defendants have breached their agreements with Miramax, infringed Miramax’s copyrights in and to Pulp Fiction, and infringed Miramax’s trademark rights in and to Pulp Fiction; injunctive relief preventing further violations of Miramax’s rights in and to Pulp Fiction; attorneys’ fees; and Miramax’s costs of suit and such other relief as the Court may deem just.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08979

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miramax, LLC

Defendants

Quentin Tarantino

Visiona Romantica, Inc.

Does 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle Alexander Casazza

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Bart H Williams

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3010

Alyson Claire Tocicki

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3010

Jeffrey D. Neuburger

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036-8299

Seth Victor

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Wai L. Choy

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036-8299

Defendant Attorneys

Bryan J Freedman

Attorney at Freedman and Taitelman LLP

1801 Century Park West 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

David Nimmer

Attorney at Irell & Manella LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Dennis Joseph Courtney

Attorney at Irell and Manella LLP

840 Newport Center Drive Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Jesse A Kaplan

Attorney at Freedman and Taitelman LLP

1801 Century Park West 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Theresa M Troupson

Attorney at Freedman and Taitelman LLP

1801 Century Park West 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/10/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#18

(#18) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc., identifying MIRAMAX, LLC, QUENTIN TARANTINO and VISIONA ROMANTICA, INC.. (Freedman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND REQUEST filed by Defendant Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc..(Attorney Bryan J Freedman added to party Quentin Tarantino(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan J Freedman added to party Visiona Romantica, Inc.(pty:dft))(Freedman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Wai Choy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, designating Kyle Casazza as local counsel #7 . (iv) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Neuburger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, designating Kyle Casazza as local counsel #6 . (iv) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

13 #3

Attachment C

13 #13

Main Document

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Quentin Tarantino. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

7 #1

Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

23 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/10/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc., identifying MIRAMAX, LLC, QUENTIN TARANTINO and VISIONA ROMANTICA, INC.. (Freedman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND REQUEST filed by Defendant Quentin Tarantino, Visiona Romantica, Inc..(Attorney Bryan J Freedman added to party Quentin Tarantino(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan J Freedman added to party Visiona Romantica, Inc.(pty:dft))(Freedman, Bryan) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Wai Choy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, designating Kyle Casazza as local counsel #7 . (iv) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Neuburger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, designating Kyle Casazza as local counsel #6 . (iv) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #10 served on November 18, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C)(Williams, Bart) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Visiona Romantica, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Quentin Tarantino. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wai L. Choy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32333727) filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Casazza, Kyle) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey D. Neuburger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Miramax, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32333639) filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kyle Alexander Casazza added to party Miramax, LLC(pty:pla)) (Casazza, Kyle) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC, (Williams, Bart) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC (Williams, Bart) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Summons for Defendant Visiona Romantica, Inc.)(Williams, Bart) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Williams, Bart) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32332555 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Miramax, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Attorney Bart H Williams added to party Miramax, LLC(pty:pla))(Williams, Bart) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISIONA ROMANTICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Miramax, llc. is a litigant