Mirabile et al v. Amazon.com Inc et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*** Civil case dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Plaintiffs' #27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (VE) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) APPENDIX re Terminate Motions, re Notice of Motion to Consolidate [Dkt 25] by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Motion terminated: #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc. Per the phone call with Defense Counsel, the wrong event type was picked. Motion is terminated and changed from a Motion to Notice. (SR) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION Notice of Motion to Consolidate Cases , filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Buckley, Brian) Modified on 7/28/2021 to correct document title (SR). (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadline: The parties' #23 Joint Stipulated MOTION is granted. The deadline by which Defendants Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, LLC must answer or move in response to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to 8/19/2021. (VE) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Joint Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order, filed by Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. Noting Date 7/13/2021, (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Upon the joint request of Plaintiffs' and Defendants' counsel in this action, and for good cause shown in light of a number of overlapping class action proceedings that have been recently filed in this District, the Court extends the initial case scheduling deadlines as follows: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/26/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/2/2021, Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2021. (VE) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amazon.com, Inc. on 6/29/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Amazon.com Services LLC on 6/29/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile. (Davidson, Stuart) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Guillaume Buell for Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, and Sandra Mirabile by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stuart A. Davidson for Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, and Sandra Mirabile by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Guillaume Buell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7144254 (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-00910, 2:21-cv-00750, 2:21cv-00809, 2:21-cv-00868, 4:21-cv-03739, by Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile. (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Maxwell H Sawyer for Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jedediah Wakefield for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jedediah Wakefield FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143180 (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Laurence F. Pulgram for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, and Amazon.com Services LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Laurence F. Pulgram FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7143107 (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/12/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/19/2021, Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stuart A. Davidson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7142534 (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Maxwell H. Sawyer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7142531 (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Buckley on behalf of Defendants Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC. (Buckley, Brian) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons(es) Electronically Re-Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (MW) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon.com Inc, Amazon.com Services LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (CDA) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ERRATA re #1 Complaint,,, signature page to complaint by Plaintiffs Mark Fladd, Stephanie Fladd, Lisa Hovasse, Diane McNealy, Michael McNealy, Mathew Merman, Sandra Mirabile (Moore, Bradley) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon.com Services LLC, Amazon.com, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7139546) Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Mark Fladd(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Stephanie Fladd(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Lisa Hovasse(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Diane McNealy(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Michael McNealy(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Mathew Merman(pty:pla), Attorney Bradley Jerome Moore added to party Sandra Mirabile(pty:pla), filed by Stephanie Fladd, Diane McNealy, Lisa Hovasse, Mathew Merman, Michael McNealy, Sandra Mirabile, Mark Fladd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Moore, Bradley) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/25/2021) (CDA). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/25/2021) (CDA). Modified on 6/25/2021 correct title of attachment 1 (CDA). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less