This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2020 at 08:31:55 (UTC).

Mintun v. Kenco Logistic Services LLC

Case Summary

On 12/26/2019 Mintun filed an Other lawsuit against Kenco Logistic Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02348

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kathy Mintun

Tyron Hill-Patterson

Defendants

Kenco Logistic Services, LLC

Kenco Logistic Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brandon Michael Wise

Attorney at PEIFFER WOLF CARR & KANE APLC

Floor 2, 818 Lafayette Avenue

St Louis, MO 63104

Paul A Lesko

Attorney at PEIFFER WOLF CARR & KANE APLC

Floor 2, 818 Lafayette Avenue

St Louis, MO 63104

David J Fish

Attorney at THE FISH LAW FIRM, P.C.

Suite 123, 200 E 5Th Ave

Naperville, IL 60563

Defendant Attorneys

Jody Kahn Mason

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC

Suite 2500, 150 North Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

Jason A Selvey

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC

Suite 2500, 150 North Michigan Avenue

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

10 #16

Exhibit Exhibit D - orders

10 #15

Exhibit Exhibit C - 200121 Order_Colon

10 #14

Exhibit Exhibit B13 - McDonald (WCA) (Mitchell)

10 #13

Exhibit Exhibit B12 - Fluker (WCA) (Mitchell)

10 #12

Exhibit Exhibit B11 - Ross v. Caremel - Transcript of motion to dismiss hearing

10 #11

Exhibit Exhibit B10 - Robertson (WCA) (Cohen)

10 #10

Exhibit Exhibit B9 - Mims (WCA) (Demacopolous)

10 #9

Exhibit Exhibit B8 - Graziano v. Royal Die and Stamping (9.26.2019) (WCA) (Rohm)

10 #8

Exhibit Exhibit B7 - Soltysik v. Parsec Report of Proceedings (WCA) (French Mall

10 #7

Exhibit Exhibit B6 - Hughes v. Mayfield (WCA) (Meyerson)

10 #6

Exhibit Exhibit B5 - Carrasco v. Freudenberg (sol & WCA) (Kane)

10 #5

Exhibit Exhibit B4 - Woodard v. Dylan's Candybar Memo Order 19-1120 (WCA) (

10 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B3 - Slater v. H&M Report of Proceedings 11-04-2019 (WCA) (Meyer

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B2 - Thomas v. KIK Custom Prods. (WCA) (Cohen)

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B1 - Ring Container 19L89 Memorandum of Decision (Albrecht) (WCA

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Treadwell v. Power Solutions (12.16.19) (WCA) (Alonso)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT KENCO LOGISTIC SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedinga filed by Plaintiffs Tyron Hill-Patterson, Kathy Mintun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Treadwell v. Power Solutions (12.16.19) (WCA) (Alonso), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B1 - Ring Container 19L89 Memorandum of Decision (Albrecht) (WCA SOL), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B2 - Thomas v. KIK Custom Prods. (WCA) (Cohen), #4 Exhibit Exhibit B3 - Slater v. H&M Report of Proceedings 11-04-2019 (WCA) (Meyerson), #5 Exhibit Exhibit B4 - Woodard v. Dylan's Candybar Memo Order 19-1120 (WCA) (Demacopolous), #6 Exhibit Exhibit B5 - Carrasco v. Freudenberg (sol & WCA) (Kane), #7 Exhibit Exhibit B6 - Hughes v. Mayfield (WCA) (Meyerson), #8 Exhibit Exhibit B7 - Soltysik v. Parsec Report of Proceedings (WCA) (French Mallen), #9 Exhibit Exhibit B8 - Graziano v. Royal Die and Stamping (9.26.2019) (WCA) (Rohm), #10 Exhibit Exhibit B9 - Mims (WCA) (Demacopolous), #11 Exhibit Exhibit B10 - Robertson (WCA) (Cohen), #12 Exhibit Exhibit B11 - Ross v. Caremel - Transcript of motion to dismiss hearing (WCA) (Albrecht), #13 Exhibit Exhibit B12 - Fluker (WCA) (Mitchell), #14 Exhibit Exhibit B13 - McDonald (WCA) (Mitchell), #15 Exhibit Exhibit C - 200121 Order_Colon, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D - orders)(Fish, David) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT KENCO LOGISTIC SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Defendant Kenco Logistic Services LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Selvey, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT KENCO LOGISTIC SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedinga filed by Plaintiffs Tyron Hill-Patterson, Kathy Mintun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Treadwell v. Power Solutions (12.16.19) (WCA) (Alonso), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B1 - Ring Container 19L89 Memorandum of Decision (Albrecht) (WCA SOL), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B2 - Thomas v. KIK Custom Prods. (WCA) (Cohen), #4 Exhibit Exhibit B3 - Slater v. H&M Report of Proceedings 11-04-2019 (WCA) (Meyerson), #5 Exhibit Exhibit B4 - Woodard v. Dylan's Candybar Memo Order 19-1120 (WCA) (Demacopolous), #6 Exhibit Exhibit B5 - Carrasco v. Freudenberg (sol & WCA) (Kane), #7 Exhibit Exhibit B6 - Hughes v. Mayfield (WCA) (Meyerson), #8 Exhibit Exhibit B7 - Soltysik v. Parsec Report of Proceedings (WCA) (French Mallen), #9 Exhibit Exhibit B8 - Graziano v. Royal Die and Stamping (9.26.2019) (WCA) (Rohm), #10 Exhibit Exhibit B9 - Mims (WCA) (Demacopolous), #11 Exhibit Exhibit B10 - Robertson (WCA) (Cohen), #12 Exhibit Exhibit B11 - Ross v. Caremel - Transcript of motion to dismiss hearing (WCA) (Albrecht), #13 Exhibit Exhibit B12 - Fluker (WCA) (Mitchell), #14 Exhibit Exhibit B13 - McDonald (WCA) (Mitchell), #15 Exhibit Exhibit C - 200121 Order_Colon, #16 Exhibit Exhibit D - orders)(Fish, David) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kenco Logistic Services LLC, filed by Kathy Mintun and Tyron Hill-Patterson.(TC, ilcd) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/7/20. Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report #8 is GRANTED. The Court directs the Clerk to file Plaintiff's Amended Complaint [8-1] instanter. The parties' deadline to file their Rule 26(f) Report is extended to 3/23/20. (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct Consent Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and for an Extension of Time to the Rule 26(f) Status Report Deadline by Plaintiff Kathy Mintun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Fish, David) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 2/4/20. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/20 is RESCHEDULED to 3/26/20 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 3/3/20. (TC, ilcd) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Stay DEFENDANT KENCO LOGISTIC SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Defendant Kenco Logistic Services LLC. Responses due by 2/14/2020 (Selvey, Jason) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by David J Fish on behalf of Kathy Mintun (Fish, David) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/3/2020. Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time #5 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 2/3/20. (Kenco Logistic Services LLC answer due 2/3/2020) (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Kenco Logistic Services LLC. Responses due by 1/16/2020 (Kahn Mason, Jody) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/27/19. A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jason A Selvey on behalf of Kenco Logistic Services, LLC (Selvey, Jason) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jody Kahn Mason on behalf of Kenco Logistic Services, LLC (Kahn Mason, Jody) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit - Macon County, State of Illinois, case number 2019L105 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3269076), filed by Kenco Logistic Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kahn Mason, Jody) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less