This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:13:27 (UTC).

MINTONE UNLIMITED INC v. ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MINTONE UNLIMITED INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are T KENT WETHERELL II and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00546

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

T KENT WETHERELL II

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mintone Unlimited, Inc.

MINTONE UNLIMITED INC

Defendant

Argonaut Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID JOHN PETTINATO

Attorney at MERLIN LAW GROUP - TAMPA FL

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 950

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT M DARROCH

Attorney at GOODMAN MCGUFFEY LINDSEY ETC - ATLANTA GA

3340 Peachtree Rd Ne, 2100 Tower Place

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#5

(#5) RULE 26 Disclosures by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY. (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re 11 Joint Report. Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 4/27/2020. Discovery due by 4/6/2020. Mediation to take place by 4/20/2020. Mediation Report due by 5/4/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/22/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group US Inc. for ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY.. (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY. (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MINTONE UNLIMITED INC. (PETTINATO, DAVID) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#6

(#6) RULE 26 Disclosures by MINTONE UNLIMITED INC. (PETTINATO, DAVID) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Argonaut Insurance Company from Bay County Circuit Court, case number 19004152CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4729331.), filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/20/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/21/2020. Discovery due by 4/6/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/6/2016. (sdw) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY. (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re 11 Joint Report. Dispositive/Daubert Motions to be filed by 4/27/2020. Discovery due by 4/6/2020. Mediation to take place by 4/20/2020. Mediation Report due by 5/4/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 1/22/2020. (sdw) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 26 Disclosures by MINTONE UNLIMITED INC. (PETTINATO, DAVID) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 26 Disclosures by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY. (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MINTONE UNLIMITED INC. (PETTINATO, DAVID) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Argo Group US Inc. for ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY.. (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/20/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/21/2020. Discovery due by 4/6/2020. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 12/6/2016. (sdw) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Argonaut Insurance Company from Bay County Circuit Court, case number 19004152CA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4729331.), filed by Argonaut Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (DARROCH, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less