This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2019 at 08:39:48 (UTC).

Minton v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 Minton filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tom S. Lee and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00570

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tom S. Lee

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Minton

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan E. Timbs

Attorney at DEREK L. HALL, PC

1911 Dunbarton Drive

Jackson, MS 39216

Derek L. Hall

Attorney at DEREK L. HALL, PC

1911 Dunbarton Drive

Jackson, MS 39216

Defendant Attorneys

Cory L. Radicioni

Attorney at WISE, CARTER, CHILD & CARAWAY, PA - Jackson

401 East Capitol Street, Suite 600, P. O. Box 651 (39205-0651)

Jackson, MS 39201

Grafton E. Bragg

Attorney at WISE, CARTER, CHILD & CARAWAY, PA - Jackson

401 East Capitol Street, Suite 600, P. O. Box 651 (39205-0651)

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L. Hall on behalf of Angela Minton (Hall, Derek) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company. (LAT) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Cory L. Radicioni on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Radicioni, Cory) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company.(Bragg, Grafton) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Minton. Allstate Insurance Company served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Timbs, Megan) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643056030), filed by Angela Minton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek L. Hall on behalf of Angela Minton (Hall, Derek) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Cory L. Radicioni on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Radicioni, Cory) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allstate Insurance Company.(Bragg, Grafton) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Minton. Allstate Insurance Company served on 8/15/2019, answer due 9/5/2019. (Timbs, Megan) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Allstate Insurance Company. (LAT) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643056030), filed by Angela Minton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.