Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2020 at 08:23:21 (UTC).

Minor et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Minor filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Joel B. Toomey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kristne Elizabeth Minor

Calvin Thomas Minor

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lee B. Balefsky

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

1525 Locust Street., 18Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Michelle L. Tiger

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

The Nineteenth Floor, 1525 Locust Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Christopher A. Gomez

Attorney at Kline & Specter

1525 Locust Street., 18Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Kent G. Whittemore

Attorney at The Whittemore Law Group, PA

Suite 304-S, 100 Second Ave S

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Aaron L. Dunbar

Attorney at Kline & Specter, P.C.

1525 Locust Street, 18Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

Molly E. Flynn

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Suite 2000, One Logan Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103-6996

James C. Barton, Jr.

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

One Federal Place, Suite 1000, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Kari L. Sutherland

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW

P. O. Box 1138

Oxford, MS 38655

William M. Gage

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy

Ridgeland, MS 39157

David B. Thomas

Attorney at Thomas Combs & Spann

Po Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338

Susan M. Robinson

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN

P. O. Box 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

Christy D. Jones

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Amanda Elizabeth Preston

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd., Suite 4700

Miami, FL 33131-2303

Andrew R. Kruppa

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4700

Miami, FL 33131-2303

 

Court Documents

58 #2

Exhibit 2

58 #1

Exhibit 1

#58

(#58) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#57

(#57) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #42 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

54 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#54

(#54) MOTION for Michelle Tiger to Withdraw as Attorney by Calvin Thomas Minor, Kristne Elizabeth Minor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 04/17/2020)

42 #2

Consent Letter and Form

42 #1

Case Management Report Form

#42

(#57) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #42 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Mahamed H. Antar on 4/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)

#8

(#8) PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2015)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/07/2015)

#2

(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 167 (QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER)entered on 02/26/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2015)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3729288. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2015)

226 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #42 Related case order and track 2 notice by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ENDORSED ORDER granting #54 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Michelle L. Tiger, Esq. is hereby permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. The Clerk is directed to terminate Ms. Tiger as counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 4/20/2020. (RLS) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson re #43 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V)(Kruppa, Andrew) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) MOTION for Michelle Tiger to Withdraw as Attorney by Calvin Thomas Minor, Kristne Elizabeth Minor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Calvin Thomas Minor, Kristne Elizabeth Minor. (Gomez, Christopher) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson identifying Other Affiliate Ethicon, Inc. for Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.. (Preston, Amanda) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ENDORSED ORDER granting #48 #49 #50 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. If Christopher A. Gomez, Esq., Lee B. Balefsky, Esq., and Aaron L. Dunbar, Esq., have not already done so, they each shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 3/24/2020. (RLS) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Verified MOTION for Aaron L. Dunbar to appear pro hac vice by Calvin Thomas Minor, Kristne Elizabeth Minor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittemore, Kent) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Verified MOTION for Lee B. Balefsky to appear pro hac vice by Calvin Thomas Minor, Kristne Elizabeth Minor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittemore, Kent) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Molly E. Flynn on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Flynn, Molly) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kristen Minor on 05/09/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Mahamed H. Antar on 4/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Calvin Thomas Minor, Kristne Elizabeth Minor. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 06/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/20/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 04/07/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 167 (QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER)entered on 02/26/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3729288. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from wvsd on 3/6/2020.] (Entered: 03/03/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron L. Dunbar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent G. Whittemore