This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:10 (UTC).

Minnion v. Dart et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Minnion filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Dart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03336

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Torey Minnion

Rushville, IL 62681

Defendants

Cook County Jail Medical Staff

Nurse Smith

Jhon Doe

Thomas Dart

Gachev

Cook County Municipal Corporation

Darryl Houston

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Envelope postmarked 5/14/2019

#5

(#5) ORDER:The Court grants Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and will neither assess an initial'partial filing fee nor direct Rushville officials to deduct funds from Plaintiff's trust account. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint in accordance with this order. Failure to submit an amended complaint by July 29, 2019 will result in dismissal of this lawsuit for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff is advised that he has a continuing obligation to keep the Court apprised of his current address. If Plaintiff does not do so, this case, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal should this case proceed past its initial stages. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/1/2019:Mailed notice(ek, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Torey Minnion (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 5/14/2019) (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Torey Minnion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit) (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Torey Minnion for attorney representation (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • MAILED a copy of an order dated 7/1/2019, an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form along with instructions to plaintiff Torey Minnion. (ek, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER:The Court grants Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #3 and will neither assess an initial'partial filing fee nor direct Rushville officials to deduct funds from Plaintiff's trust account. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint in accordance with this order. Failure to submit an amended complaint by July 29, 2019 will result in dismissal of this lawsuit for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff is advised that he has a continuing obligation to keep the Court apprised of his current address. If Plaintiff does not do so, this case, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to renewal should this case proceed past its initial stages. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form, a blank USM-285 form, and instructions along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 7/1/2019:Mailed notice(ek, ) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Torey Minnion for attorney representation (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Torey Minnion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit) (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Torey Minnion (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 5/14/2019) (sxb, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less