This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2019 at 07:01:25 (UTC).

Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company v. Rack, et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2019 Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Rack. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Miller and Raymond A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

Presiding Judge

Raymond A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Benjamin C Banks

Carol Duval

Rack & Moccia, P.C.

Kevin B. Rack

Benjamin C. Banks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Danny Mark Howell

Attorney at Law Offices of Danny M Howell PLLC

200 Little Falls Road, Suite 207

Falls Church, VA 22046

Brandt Gerard Cordelli

Attorney at Law Offices of Danny M. Howell, PLLC

200 Little Falls Road, Suite 207

Falls Church, VA 22046

Robert Jackson Martin, IV

Attorney at Law Offices of Danny M Howell PLLC

200 Little Falls Road, Suite 207

Falls Church, VA 22046

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Benjamin Paul Kyber

Attorney at The Mottley Law Firm PLC

1700 Bayberry Court, Suite 203

Richmond, VA 23226

William Thomas Chappell

Attorney at Vandeventer Black LLP (Norfolk)

101 West Main St, Suite 500

Norfolk, VA 23510

Melissa Roberts Tannery

Attorney at Mauck & Brooke PLC

416 West Franklin St

Richmond, VA 23220

Andrew Gray Mauck

Attorney at Mauck & Brooke PLC

416 West Franklin St

Richmond, VA 23220

 

Court Documents

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

#1

(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6454499.), filed by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howell, Danny) (Entered: 01/20/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) (Entered: 01/20/2019)

#3

Notice of Correction re #5 , #6 , #4 , #3 Proposed Summons. Documents number 3, 4, 5, and 6 were filed using the wrong docket event. The "Proposed Summons" event was incorrectly filed as "Exhibit." The Clerk's Office has corrected this error. (jrin) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gray Mauck on behalf of Benjamin C. Banks (Mauck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Roberts Tannery on behalf of Benjamin C. Banks (Tannery, Melissa) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Carol Duval.(Kyber, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Kevin B. Rack, Rack & Moccia, P.C..(Chappell, William) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Kevin B. Rack, Rack & Moccia, P.C..(Chappell, William) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company by Benjamin C. Banks.(Tannery, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service Upon Benjamin Banks by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Rack & Moccia, P.C. by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gray Mauck on behalf of Benjamin C. Banks (Mauck, Andrew) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #16 Notice of Appearance. The filing user's login does not match the signature on document number 16. The attorney whose signature block appears on the document must refile the document. (jrin) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Roberts Tannery on behalf of Benjamin C. Banks (Tannery, Melissa) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Carol Duval.(Kyber, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Kevin B. Rack, Rack & Moccia, P.C..(Chappell, William) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #13 Answer to Complaint. Document number 13 the filing user's login does not match the signature on the document. The filing user must refile the document with the filing user's signature block, or the attorney whose signature block appears on the document must refile the document. (jrin) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Kevin B. Rack, Rack & Moccia, P.C..(Chappell, William) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company by Benjamin C. Banks.(Tannery, Melissa) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service Upon Benjamin Banks by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Rack & Moccia, P.C. by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service upon Kevin Rack by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Benjamin C. Banks, Carol Duval, Kevin B. Rack, Rack & Moccia, P.C..NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(jrin) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #5 , #6 , #4 , #3 Proposed Summons. Documents number 3, 4, 5, and 6 were filed using the wrong docket event. The "Proposed Summons" event was incorrectly filed as "Exhibit." The Clerk's Office has corrected this error. (jrin) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Summons for Rack & Moccia, P.C. by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company.. (Howell, Danny) Modified docket text on 2/4/2019 (jrin). (Entered: 02/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons for Kevin Rack by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) Modified docket text on 2/4/2019 (jrin). (Entered: 02/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons for Carol Duval by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) Modified docket text on 2/4/2019 (jrin). (Entered: 02/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons for Benjamin Banks by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) Modified docket text on 2/4/2019 (jrin). (Entered: 02/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny) (Entered: 01/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6454499.), filed by Minnesota Lawyers Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howell, Danny) (Entered: 01/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.