This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 08:15:50 (UTC).

Minner v. American Heritage Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 Minner filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Heritage Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Grady Jennings and Colin H. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

Referral Judge

Colin H. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jessica Minner

Defendant

American Heritage Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Bahe, Jr.

Attorney at Bahe Cook Cantley & Nefzger PLC

1041 Goss Avenue

Louisville, KY 40217

Patrick E. Markey

Attorney at Bahe Cook Cantley & Nefzger PLC

1041 Goss Avenue

Louisville, KY 40217

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew G. Jubinsky, Jr.

Attorney at Figari & Davenport, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202

Matthew B. Skidmore

901 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202

Will Messer

Attorney at Miller Edwards Rambicure PLLC - Lexington

300 E. Main Street, Suite 360

Lexington, KY 40507

Matthew Skidmore

Attorney at Figari & Davenport, LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 3400

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/16/2022 granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #11 MOTION to Remand. The deadline for AHL to file its response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is hereby EXTENDED through and including 6/24/2022. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#14

(#14) Joint STATUS REPORT by Jessica Minner and by American Heritage Life Insurance Company. (Skidmore, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#13

(#13) Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by American Heritage Life Insurance Company. (Skidmore, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

11 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/19/2022 granting #9 Motion for Matthew Skidmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Exhibit Texas Bar Cert of Good Standing

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/17/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

1 #6

Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Service of Process Transmittal

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Preliminary Expert Witness Disclosure

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Kennedy Declaration

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by American Heritage Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) (Skidmore, Matthew) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/16/2022 granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #11 MOTION to Remand. The deadline for AHL to file its response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is hereby EXTENDED through and including 6/24/2022. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint STATUS REPORT by Jessica Minner and by American Heritage Life Insurance Company. (Skidmore, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by American Heritage Life Insurance Company. (Skidmore, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand by Defendant American Heritage Life Insurance Company (Skidmore, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2022: #1 Proposed Order) (SMJ). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Jessica Minner (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bahe, John) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/19/2022 granting #9 Motion for Matthew Skidmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Matthew B. Skidmore to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3584804. by Defendant American Heritage Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Texas Bar Cert of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Messer, Will) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/17/2022. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 6/28/2022 at 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency Matthew Skidmore re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/23/2022. (KJA) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/5/2022; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-CHL. (ARM) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by American Heritage Life Insurance Company. (Messer, Will) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court and Counsel of Record/Parties, re #1 Notice of Removal. (DeW) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for American Heritage Life Insurance Company by American Heritage Life Insurance Company. (DeW) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DeW) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-001618, filed by American Heritage Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AKYWDC-3571147.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Kennedy Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Preliminary Expert Witness Disclosure, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons, #5 Exhibit 5 - Service of Process Transmittal, #6 Cover Sheet) (DeW) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN HERITAGE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew G. Jubinsky