This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 07:05:47 (UTC).

Mingo et al v. Optum360 Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Mingo filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Optum360 Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03083

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roslynn R. Mauskopf

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christian Sims

Onique Morris

Malik Mingo

Defendants

Lisa Rodriguez

OPTUM 360, LLC

Kelvin Iglesias

OPTUM360 SERVICES, INC.

Lisa Perry

UNITED HEALTH WORLD GROUP, INC.

NORTHWELL HEALTH, INC.

NORTHWELL HEALTHCARE, INC.

Michelle Puelo

Michelle Puleo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Parisis G. Filippatos

Attorney at Philips & Associates PLLC

45 Broadway, Suite 620

New York, NY 10006

Erica R. Sanders

Attorney at The Ottinger Firm, P.C.

401 Park Avenue South

New York, NY 10016

Yusha D. Hiraman

Attorney at Phillips and Associates, Attorneys at Law, P.L.L.C.

45 Broadway, Suite 620

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney /Withdrawal of Appearance of Yusha D. Hiraman by Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

#17

(#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 A.M. on 8/23/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 8/23/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/19/2019. (Manson, Eddie) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Kelvin Iglesias waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Lisa Perry waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Lisa Rodriguez waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Northwell Healthcare, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#8

No Description Available

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Yusha D. Hiraman on behalf of Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims (aty to be noticed) (Hiraman, Yusha) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. Re Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information., by Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: The motion to withdraw #18 is granted. Attorney Yusha D. Hiraman is hereby terminated from the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 7/21/2019. (Murphy, Colleen) (Entered: 07/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney /Withdrawal of Appearance of Yusha D. Hiraman by Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:30 A.M. on 8/23/2019 before Magistrate Judge Bulsara in Courtroom 324N. All counsel must attend. Plaintiff is directed to notify Defendant of this scheduling order at the time that Defendant makes an appearance in this matter. Counsel are also directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than two days before 8/23/2019. Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the discovery worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara on 6/19/2019. (Manson, Eddie) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Michelle Puleo waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Kelvin Iglesias waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Lisa Perry waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Lisa Rodriguez waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Northwell Healthcare, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. Northwell Health, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. United Health World Group, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Yusha D. Hiraman on behalf of Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims (aty to be noticed) (Hiraman, Yusha) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica R. Sanders on behalf of Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims (aty to be noticed) (Sanders, Erica) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. Re Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information., by Malik Mingo, Onique Morris, Christian Sims (Filippatos, Parisis) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Proposed summons is rejected; the caption on the summons does not match the caption of the complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider with the full caption; the Clerk's Office cannot issue the summons with an incorrect caption. Counsel is advised to submit a completed proposed summons using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Incorrect Document Entry Information. Defendants were added to the case incorrectly; docket entry 1 was deleted and re-entered against corrected defendants. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • FILING FEE: $400, receipt number ANYEDC-11510203 (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Christian Sims, Onique Morris, Malik Mingo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.