This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2020 at 08:59:33 (UTC).

MING v. STATE OF GEORGIA et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 MING filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against STATE OF GEORGIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARC THOMAS TREADWELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC THOMAS TREADWELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BEVERLYN MING

Defendants

GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

STATE OF GEORGIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neal B. Graham

P.O. Box 1017

Macon, GA 31202-1017

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Summons GA Department of Public Health

#4

(#4) Summons Reissued as to GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, STATE OF GEORGIA. Amended to add the seal. (Attachments: #1 Summons GA Department of Public Health)(tam) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

3 #1

Summons GA Department of Public Health

#3

(#3) Summons WERE RE-ISSUED AT #4 as to GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: #1 Summons GA Department of Public Health)(tam) Modified DOCKET TEXT on 2/21/2020 (tam). (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#2

(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BEVERLYN MING (tam) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons State of Georgia

1 #1

Summons Ga Dept Public Health

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3394582, $400 filed by BEVERLYN MING (Attachments: #1 Summons Ga Dept Public Health, #2 Summons State of Georgia, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graham, Neal) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Reissued as to GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, STATE OF GEORGIA. Amended to add the seal. (Attachments: #1 Summons GA Department of Public Health)(tam) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons WERE RE-ISSUED AT #4 as to GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH, STATE OF GEORGIA. (Attachments: #1 Summons GA Department of Public Health)(tam) Modified DOCKET TEXT on 2/21/2020 (tam). (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to BEVERLYN MING (tam) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by BEVERLYN MING ); Summons must be completed by attorney. Please complete summonses and email to macon.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov. (tam) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3394582, $400 filed by BEVERLYN MING (Attachments: #1 Summons Ga Dept Public Health, #2 Summons State of Georgia, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graham, Neal) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less