This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 07:56:04 (UTC).

Minervini v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by Minervini against Social Security Administration, Commissioner of in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00881

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eli J. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rajeana Carole Minervini

Defendant

Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Interested Party

SSA-Email Notification

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karl E. Osterhout

Attorney at Law Office of Karl E. Osterhout, LLC

521 Cedar Way, Suite 200

Oakmont, PA 15139

Robert Scott Wilson

Attorney at The Wilson Firm, PLLC

2288 Gunbarrel Road, Suite 154, No. 225

Chattanooga, TN 37421

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/7/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Robert Scott Wilson. (jm) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Scott Wilson on behalf of Rajeana Carole Minervini (Wilson, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 10/7/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for attorney Karl E. Osterhout to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3006399) by Rajeana Carole Minervini. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Osterhout, Karl) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 10/25/2019. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • NOTICE TO COUNSEL Karl E. Osterhout: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 10/25/2019. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • PA State Bar status verified as active for Karl E. Osterhout. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Rajeana Carole Minervini. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (jm) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Rajeana Carole Minervini. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(jm) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.