This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 08:13:48 (UTC).

Minden Pictures, Inc. v. Cartan Tours, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Minden Pictures, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cartan Tours, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06912

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Minden Pictures, Inc.

Defendant

Cartan Tours, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonah Adam Grossbardt

Attorney at SRIPLAW

1801 Century Park East Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Mira Hofmann

Attorney at Law Office of H Michael Soroy

11766 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 270

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Michael D Niemi

Attorney at Law Offices of H Michael Soroy

11766 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 270

Los Angeles, CA 90025

H Michael Soroy

Attorney at H Michael Soroy Law Office

11766 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 270

Los Angeles, CA 90025-6547

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Supplemental Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc., (Niemi, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (iv) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Certification and Notice of Interested Parties should have been filed as a separate document using correct event, Civil Events - Other Filings - Notices -Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

11 #2

Proof of Service

11 #1

Notice of Interested Parties

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Proof of Service)(Attorney Michael D Niemi added to party Cartan Tours, Inc.(pty:dft))(Niemi, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc. (et) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc., (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#5

(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27446074 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Minden Pictures, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Supplemental Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc., (Niemi, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (iv) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Certification and Notice of Interested Parties should have been filed as a separate document using correct event, Civil Events - Other Filings - Notices -Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interested Parties, #2 Proof of Service)(Attorney Michael D Niemi added to party Cartan Tours, Inc.(pty:dft))(Niemi, Michael) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cartan Tours, Inc. (et) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc., (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27446074 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Minden Pictures, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Minden Pictures, Inc.(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less