This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2022 at 07:47:17 (UTC).

MIMO Research, LLC v. Texas Instruments Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 MIMO Research, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Texas Instruments Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and James Boone Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

James Boone Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIMO Research, LLC

Defendant

Texas Instruments Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

Daniel P. Hipskind

Attorney at Berger & Hipskind LLP - Beverly Hills

9538 Brighton Way, Suite 320

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - '854 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - '166 Patent

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MIMO Research, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MIMO Research, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Daniel P. Hipskind on behalf of MIMO Research, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of MIMO Research, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Instruments Inc. (slo, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Texas Instruments Inc.. Texas Instruments Inc. waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/5/2022. (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Texas Instruments Inc.. Texas Instruments Inc. waiver sent on 7/7/2022, answer due 9/5/2022. (Abraham, Amanda) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Texas Instruments Inc. (slo, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter. (slo, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of MIMO Research, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Daniel P. Hipskind on behalf of MIMO Research, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MIMO Research, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MIMO Research, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Texas Instruments Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9004832.), filed by MIMO Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '854 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '166 Patent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Instruments, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel P. Hipskind

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth L DeRieux