This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2022 at 10:15:34 (UTC).

MIMO Research, LLC v. Qorvo, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 MIMO Research, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Qorvo, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and James Boone Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

James Boone Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIMO Research, LLC

Defendant

Qorvo, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel P. Hipskind

Attorney at Berger & Hipskind LLP - Beverly Hills

9538 Brighton Way, Suite 320

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Elizabeth L DeRieux

Attorney at Capshaw DeRieux LLP

114 E Commerce Avenue

Gladewater, TX 75647

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A - '470 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - '057 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit C - '382 Patent

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MIMO Research, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MIMO Research, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Daniel P. Hipskind on behalf of MIMO Research, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of MIMO Research, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Qorvo, Inc. (slo, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MIMO Research, LLC. Qorvo, Inc. served on 6/22/2022, answer due 7/13/2022. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Qorvo, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#10

(#10) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Qorvo, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 5:22-cv 00073. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial. The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated Defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/10/2022. (slo, ) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketThis civil action is consolidated with Case No. 5:22-Cv-00073 designated as the LEAD CASE. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial. (slo, ) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 5:22-cv 00073. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Individual cases remain active for trial. The Clerk is instructed to add the consolidated Defendants into the Lead Case and their corresponding Lead and Local Counsel only. Additional counsel may file a Notice of Appearance in the Lead Case if they wish to continue as counsel of record in the lead consolidated action. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/10/2022. (slo, ) (Entered: 08/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Magistrate Judge James Boone Baxter for all pretrial matters. (slo, ) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Qorvo, Inc. to 8/27/2022. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Qorvo, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Qorvo, Inc. to 8/12/2022. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Qorvo, Inc.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by MIMO Research, LLC. Qorvo, Inc. served on 6/22/2022, answer due 7/13/2022. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Qorvo, Inc. (slo, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (slo, ) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of MIMO Research, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Daniel P. Hipskind on behalf of MIMO Research, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MIMO Research, LLC. (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MIMO Research, LLC (Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Qorvo, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8983245.), filed by MIMO Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '470 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '057 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '382 Patent, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hipskind, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Qorvo, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel P. Hipskind

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth L DeRieux