This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:59:58 (UTC).

Mimi v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Mimi filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Home Depot U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02197

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Withers Randy

Withers Lavette Mimi

HD Development of Maryland, Inc.

Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

The Home Depot Pro

Not Classified By Court

Temiika Gipson

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory D. Mangrum

Attorney at MANGRUM & MANGRUM

1025 Oakhaven Rd.

Memphis, TN 38119

Ricky D Click

Attorney at RICKY D. CLICK

1255 Lynnfield Rd., Suite 141

Memphis, TN 38119

Defendant Attorneys

John F. Floyd

Attorney at FLOYD LAW GROUP, PLC

3990 Hillsboro Pike, Suite 300

Nashville, TN 37215

Derrick L. Bingham

Attorney at OWEN, GLEATON, EGAN, JONES & SWEENEY LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 3000

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) NOTICE by Withers Lavette Mimi of Service of Discovery (Mangrum, Gregory) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Ricky D Click on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Click, Ricky) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. of Service of Discovery (Bingham, Derrick) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#22

(#22) ANSWER to Interrogatories from Gregory D.Mangrum by All Plaintiffs.(Mangrum, Gregory) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER on Mediation. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 05/01/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/20/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 9/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/25/2019. Discovery due by 8/25/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/27/2019. Motions due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 05/01/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#16

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.; Corporate Parent HD Development Holdings, Inc. for HD Development of Maryland, Inc... (Floyd, John) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

#3

(#3) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Floyd, John) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE by Withers Lavette Mimi of Service of Discovery (Mangrum, Gregory) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Ricky D Click on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Click, Ricky) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. of Service of Discovery (Bingham, Derrick) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to Interrogatories from Gregory D.Mangrum by All Plaintiffs.(Mangrum, Gregory) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #22 Answer to Interrogatories filed by Withers Randy, Withers Lavette Mimi has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: "Wet Signature". See ECF Policies and Procedures 10.1 Effectiveness of Electronic Signature. Failure to provide that electronic signature will rneder the filing deficient. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ANSWER to Interrogatories from Gregory D.Mangrum by All Plaintiffs.(Mangrum, Gregory) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • (#21) SETTING LETTER: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Status Conference set for Friday, 9/20/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. (wrh) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER on Mediation. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 05/01/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/20/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr.. ADR deadline is 9/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 5/25/2019. Discovery due by 8/25/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 5/27/2019. Motions due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 05/01/2019. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • (#18) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 5/1/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff, Gregory D. Mangrum present in Court; Defense counsel, Derrick L. Bingham present telephonically. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case. The Court accepts the proposed scheduling order and will enter an Order on Mediation. Case set Friday, 09/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m. for Status Conference. (Court Reporter Lisa Mayo.) (wrh) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.; Corporate Parent HD Development Holdings, Inc. for HD Development of Maryland, Inc... (Floyd, John) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #8 Attachment filed by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. has been filed. For future reference, please note do not use "Wet signature". Please see ECF Polices and Procedures 10.1 Electronic Signatures.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTACHMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Floyd, John) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Filer did not include a civil cover sheet with the notice of removal. Please complete and submit under the event "Attachment" and link the filing to DE # 1. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by HD Development of Maryland, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Floyd, John) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., HD Development of Maryland, Inc. from Circuit Court of Tennessee for the Thirteenth Judicial District at Memphis, case number CT-0746-19 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3026963), filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., HD Development of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Floyd, John) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.