This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2020 at 09:47:57 (UTC).

Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation v. Shaf International Inc

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Shaf International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn Adelman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00161

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation

Defendant

Shaf International Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John C Scheller

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

1 S Pinckney St - Ste 700, Po Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701-1806

Tanya M Salman

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

1 S Pinckney St - Ste 700, Po Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701-1806

Laura M Konkel

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

1 S Pinckney St - Ste 700, Po Box 1806

Madison, WI 53701-1806

Defendant Attorney

Adam L Brookman

Attorney at Boyle Fredrickson SC

840 N Plankinton Ave

Milwaukee, WI 53203

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - December 2, 2019 Cease and Desist Letter

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - April 22, 2019 Cease and Desist Letter

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - March 27, 2019 Cease and Desist Letter

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Printouts of Amazon.com listings

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Printouts of Amazon.com search

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Printouts from Shaft's website showing Shaf's Marks in con

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Printouts from Shaf's website showing Shaf's Marks in conn

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - TSDR records for Shaf's Marks

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Printouts from USPTO's TSDR database

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Photos of Milwaukee Tool's Heated Gear

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Shaf International Inc . (Brookman, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M Konkel on behalf of Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura M. Konkel (Konkel, Laura)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/18/20. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on April 28, 2020 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by Shaf International Inc.(Brookman, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam L Brookman on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Adam L. Brookman (Brookman, Adam)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation. Shaf International Inc served on 2/11/2020. (Scheller, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Salman, Tanya)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya M Salman on behalf of Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Tanya M. Salman (Salman, Tanya)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Shaf International Inc. (bx)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation. (Scheller, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Shaf International Inc by Milwaukee Electric Tool Corporation. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3349026) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Photos of Milwaukee Tool's Heated Gear, #2 Exhibit 2 - Printouts from USPTO's TSDR database, #3 Exhibit 3 - TSDR records for Shaf's Marks, #4 Exhibit 4 - Printouts from Shaf's website showing Shaf's Marks in connection with Heated Gear, #5 Exhibit 5 - Printouts from Shaft's website showing Shaf's Marks in connection with Tool Bags, #6 Exhibit 6 - Printouts of Amazon.com search, #7 Exhibit 7 - Printouts of Amazon.com listings, #8 Exhibit 8 - March 27, 2019 Cease and Desist Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - April 22, 2019 Cease and Desist Letter, #10 Exhibit 10 - December 2, 2019 Cease and Desist Letter, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Scheller, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Shaf International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MILWAUKEE ELECTRIC TOOL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam L Brookman