This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:53:02 (UTC).

Milton v. Bateman

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Milton filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Bateman. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00700

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trevor Milton

Defendant

David Bateman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew R. Lewis

Attorney at KUNZLER BEAN & ADAMSON

50 W Broadway Ste 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Ryan B. Bell

Attorney at KUNZLER BEAN & ADAMSON

50 W Broadway Ste 1000

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Samuel W. Salyer

Attorney at HUGHES HUBBARD & REED LLP

1775 I St Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Terence M. Healy

Attorney at HUGHES HUBBARD & REED LLP

One Battery Park Plaza

New York, NY 10004

Defendant Attorneys

Darren G. Reid

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

222 S Main St Ste 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Brandon T. Christensen

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

222 S Main St Ste 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Eric G. Maxfield

Attorney at HOLLAND & HART LLP

222 S Main St Ste 2200

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). The deadline for Defendant to file a reply in support of its Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss is extended to December 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/24/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant David Bateman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Reid, Darren) Modified on 11/24/2020 by modifying event (lnp). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Terence M. Healy for Trevor Milton.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/23/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Samuel W. Salyer for Trevor Milton.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/23/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#14

(#14) Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff Trevor Milton. (Bell, Ryan) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T. Christensen on behalf of David Bateman (Christensen, Brandon) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Maxfield on behalf of David Bateman (Maxfield, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

10 #7

Exhibit G

10 #6

Exhibit F

10 #5

Exhibit E

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant David Bateman. Attorney Darren G. Reid added to party David Bateman(pty:dft)(Reid, Darren) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order Order

8 #1

Exhibit PHV Applicattion

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Terence Healy , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3758863,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Trevor Milton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Applicattion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order Order

7 #1

Exhibit PHV Application

#7

(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel W. Salyer , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number BUTDC-3758851,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Trevor Milton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). The deadline for Defendant to file a reply in support of its Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss is extended to December 11, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/24/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant David Bateman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead.(Reid, Darren) Modified on 11/24/2020 by modifying event (lnp). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Terence M. Healy for Trevor Milton.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/23/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Samuel W. Salyer for Trevor Milton.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/23/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Plaintiff Trevor Milton. (Bell, Ryan) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING MOTION #7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel W. Salyer , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number BUTDC-3758851 and #8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Terence Healy , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3758863, Motions referred to Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 11/13/2020. (no document attaached)(rks) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T. Christensen on behalf of David Bateman (Christensen, Brandon) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Maxfield on behalf of David Bateman (Maxfield, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Brandon T. Christensen in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant David Bateman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Reid, Darren) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant David Bateman. Attorney Darren G. Reid added to party David Bateman(pty:dft)(Reid, Darren) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Terence Healy , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3758863,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Trevor Milton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Applicattion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Samuel W. Salyer , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number BUTDC-3758851,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Trevor Milton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PHV Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Lewis, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff(s) must propose a discovery schedule to defendant(s) in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 10/8/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 10/7/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trevor Milton as to David Bateman served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Bell, Ryan) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to David Bateman. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against David Bateman (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BUTDC-3743543) filed by Trevor Milton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Bell, Ryan) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Trevor Milton is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw) Modified on 10/5/2020 (dw). (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less