This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/09/2020 at 11:01:54 (UTC).

Milton v. Allstate Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 Milton filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Debra Milton

Defendants

Allstate Insurance Company

The Servicemaster Company

ServiceMaster Restore

ServiceMaster Restoration by Eliana

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathryn Ann Lumpkin

Attorney at Albright & Lumpkin, P.C.

13410 Hollypark Dr

Houston, TX 77015

Dennis J Albright

Attorney at Albright And Lumpkin PC

13410 Holly Park

Houston, TX 77015

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Robert Cowan

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

1400 Lavaca Street, Suite 1000

Austin, TX 78701

Richard W. Sliman

Attorney at Butler Snow LLP

1300 25Th Ave, Suite 204

Gulfport, MS 39501

David James Alfini

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N Franklin, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

Rebecca A Moore

Attorney at Sheehy, Ware and Pappas,PLLC

909 Fannin St., Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

George Plato Pappas

Attorney at Sheehy Ware and Pappas PC

909 Fannin, Ste 2500

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#29

28 #5

Docket Control Order

28 #4

Initial Discovery Protocols

28 #3

Standing Protective ORder

28 #2

Joint Discovery Plan

28 #1

Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint

#28

#25

#23

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Summons Issued as to ServiceMaster Restoration by Eliana. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Request for Issuance of Summons as to ServiceMaster Restoration by Eliana, filed. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Joint Discovery Plan, #3 Standing Protective ORder, #4 Initial Discovery Protocols, #5 Docket Control Order)(Albright, Dennis) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by ServiceMaster Restore, The Servicemaster Company, filed.(Pappas, George) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) AMENDED ANSWER to #23 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company, filed. (Cowan, Christopher) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kathryn Ann Lumpkin as to Debra Milton re: #18 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kathryn Ann Lumpkin re: #19 Protective Order, filed. Document re-noticed, address updated (State Bar of Texas). (FernandoVilla, 5) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Debra Milton.(Albright, Dennis) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Kathryn Ann Lumpkin for Debra Milton re: #21 Scheduling Order,filed. An updated address could not be found. (MelissaMorgan, 4) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury trial. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2020. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/12/2020. Pltf Expert Report due by 6/12/2020. Deft Expert Witness List due by 7/17/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 7/17/2020. Discovery due by 9/18/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/9/2020. All other Pretrial Motions due by 11/16/2020. Joint Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 1/8/2021. Docket Call set for 1/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Sixth Floor Courtroom before Judge Jeffrey V Brown. Trial set for February/March 2021 subject to short notice.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(dwilkerson, 3) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMinute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Initial conference held on January 14, 2020. The court and parties conferred and the court set out a schedule for the case. The scheduling order will be entered separately. Appearances: Richard W. Sliman, Dennis J Albright and George Plato Pappas. (ERO:Yes), filed. (wbostic, 4) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ServiceMaster Restore, The Servicemaster Company identifying ServiceMaster Global Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Alfini, David) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Y by ServiceMaster Restore, The Servicemaster Company, filed.(Alfini, David) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David J Alfini on behalf of ServiceMaster Restore, The Servicemaster Company, filed. (Alfini, David) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Richard W. Sliman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(GeorgeCardenas, 4) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Conference reset for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison (agould, 3) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allstate Insurance Company, filed.(Cowan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Richard W. Sliman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Allstate Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2019. (Cowan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Allstate Insurance Company, filed.(Cowan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Galveston County-56th District Court, case number 19-CV-1515 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23216643) filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cowan, Christopher) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SERVICEMASTER A PLUS RESTORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard W. Sliman