This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2020 at 09:03:33 (UTC).

Milman v. Fieger & Fieger, P.C. et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2020 Milman filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Fieger Fieger, P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen J. Murphy, III and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-12154

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen J. Murphy, III

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Polina Milman

Defendants

Fieger & Fieger, P.C.

Geoffrey Fieger

Fieger, Fieger Kenney & Harrington, P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deborah L. Gordon

Attorney at Deborah L. Gordon Assoc.

33 Bloomfield Hills Parkway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor

Attorney at Deborah Gordon Law

33 Bloomfield Hills Parway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Sarah Gordon Thomas

Attorney at Deborah Gordon Law

33 Bloomfield Hills Parkway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Polina Milman against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Geoffrey Fieger served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fieger & Fieger, P.C. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting Ex Parte #6 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

6 #8

Exhibit G - Detroit Free Press Article

6 #7

Exhibit F - Email to S. Teal

6 #6

Exhibit E - USPS tracking - office

6 #5

Exhibit D - USPS tracking - home

6 #4

Exhibit C - Lynne Sheridan's Affidavit

6 #3

Exhibit B - Aaron Marlow's Affidavit

6 #2

Exhibit A - Copy of LARA report

6 #1

Index of Exhibits

#6

(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Alternate Service by Polina Milman. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Copy of LARA report, #3 Exhibit B - Aaron Marlow's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - Lynne Sheridan's Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D - USPS tracking - home, #6 Exhibit E - USPS tracking - office, #7 Exhibit F - Email to S. Teal, #8 Exhibit G - Detroit Free Press Article) (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gordon Thomas on behalf of Polina Milman. (Thomas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Polina Milman against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed.. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Geoffrey Fieger served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Fieger & Fieger, P.C. served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting Ex Parte #6 Motion for Alternate Service. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPar) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Ex Parte MOTION for Alternate Service by Polina Milman. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Copy of LARA report, #3 Exhibit B - Aaron Marlow's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C - Lynne Sheridan's Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D - USPS tracking - home, #6 Exhibit E - USPS tracking - office, #7 Exhibit F - Email to S. Teal, #8 Exhibit G - Detroit Free Press Article) (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gordon Thomas on behalf of Polina Milman. (Thomas, Sarah) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor on behalf of Polina Milman. (Taylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Fieger & Fieger, P.C.* (DWor) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Geoffrey Fieger* (DWor) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7981645 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less