Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 08:10:43 (UTC).

Mills v. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 Mills filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kenneth G. Gale and J. Thomas Marten. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02042

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

Presiding Judge

J. Thomas Marten

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Mills

Defendants

Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.

Talx UCM Services, Inc.

Quest Diagnostics TB, Inc.

LabOne, LLC

LabOne, LLC a foreign corporation doing business as Quest Diagnostics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sophie A. Woodworth

Attorney at Holman Schiavone, LLC

4600 Madison, Suite 810

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy Murrow Bunck

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - KC

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

Claudia My Tran

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - KC

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/6/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/6/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/24/20. (aw) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LabOne, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. identifying Quest Diagnostics Holdings Incorporated as corporate parent . (Bunck, Stacy) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#10

(#10) Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by LabOne, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., LabOne, LLC d/b/a Quest Diagostics, filed by Nicole Mills.(Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

7 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiff Nicole Mills (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#6

(#6) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/5/2020 for Defendants Quest Diagnostics TB, Inc., Talx UCM Services, Inc., Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/19/2020. (ca) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Nicole Mills upon Talx UCM Services, Inc. served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020 (Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Nicole Mills upon Quest Diagnostics TB, Inc. served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020 (Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Nicole Mills upon Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020 (Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Nicole Mills. (Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5041776.), filed by Nicole Mills.(Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/6/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/6/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/24/20. (aw) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LabOne, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. identifying Quest Diagnostics Holdings Incorporated as corporate parent . (Bunck, Stacy) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by LabOne, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc..(Bunck, Stacy) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., LabOne, LLC d/b/a Quest Diagostics, filed by Nicole Mills.(Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #7 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #1 . Amended Complaint shall be filed, in form attached to motion, on or before March 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/5/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Plaintiff Nicole Mills (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/5/2020 for Defendants Quest Diagnostics TB, Inc., Talx UCM Services, Inc., Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 2/19/2020. (ca) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Nicole Mills upon Talx UCM Services, Inc. served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020 (Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- personal service by Nicole Mills upon Quest Diagnostics TB, Inc. served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020 (Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Nicole Mills upon Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020 (Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., Quest Diagnostics TB, Inc., Talx UCM Services, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Nicole Mills. (Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5041776.), filed by Nicole Mills.(Woodworth, Sophie) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quest Diagnostics Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sophie A. Woodworth