This case was last updated from PACER on 06/01/2020 at 14:30:20 (UTC).

Mills v. Manson Construction Co.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 Mills filed a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit against Manson Construction Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Gerard Guidry and Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01103

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

Referral Judge

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David S Mills

David Mills

Defendants

Manson Construction Co.

ABC Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Patrick Daniel, Jr.

Attorney at Law Offices of D. Patrick Daniel, Jr., LLC

P. O. Drawer 51709, Suite 202

Lafayette, LA 70505-1709

Defendant Attorneys

Justin Cole Warner

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

Evans Martin McLeod

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar, LLP (New Orleans)

365 Canal St., Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130-6534

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#15

(#15) DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Manson Construction Co. served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020. (Daniel, David) Modified text on 5/4/2020 (mm). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Manson Construction Co. re #6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement. (mm) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

12 #2

Proposed Pleading

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

(#12) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 6 by Manson Construction Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Warner, Justin) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#10

(#10) **ATTACHED CORRECTLY TO REC. DOC. 9** Amendment/Supplement to Document by David Mills re #9 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Exhibit #3 (Daniel, David) Modified text on 4/22/2020 (mm). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

9 #3

Exhibit 3

9 #2

Exhibit #2

9 #1

Exhibit #1

#9

(#9) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by David Mills re #6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2)(Daniel, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2020: #3 Exhibit 3) (mm). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mm) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

6 #3

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION for a More Definite Statement by Manson Construction Co. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission) Attorney Justin Cole Warner added to party Manson Construction Co.(pty:dft).(Warner, Justin) Modified text/added submission date on 4/15/2020 (mm). (Entered: 04/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by David Mills. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney David Patrick Daniel, Jr added to party David Mills(pty:pla).(Daniel, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). Modified text on 4/6/2020 (mm). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Manson Construction Co. served on 4/30/2020, answer due 5/21/2020. (Daniel, David) Modified text on 5/4/2020 (mm). (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Manson Construction Co. re #6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement. (mm) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 6 by Manson Construction Co.. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 4/29/2020. (tjg) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum re: rec. doc. 6 by Manson Construction Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Warner, Justin) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Amendment/Supplement to Document. **Filing attorney should have attached this filing to record document 9. Clerk has correctly attached the filing to document 9. No further action is required.** (mm) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) **ATTACHED CORRECTLY TO REC. DOC. 9** Amendment/Supplement to Document by David Mills re #9 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Exhibit #3 (Daniel, David) Modified text on 4/22/2020 (mm). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by David Mills re #6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2)(Daniel, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2020: #3 Exhibit 3) (mm). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mm) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 MOTION for a More Definite Statement. **Filing attorney should have selected No at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Clerk took corrective action to set motion for submission on 4/29/2020 before Judge Guidry. No further action is necessary.** (mm) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for a More Definite Statement by Manson Construction Co. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission) Attorney Justin Cole Warner added to party Manson Construction Co.(pty:dft).(Warner, Justin) Modified text/added submission date on 4/15/2020 (mm). (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. 1. **Corrected complaint was subsequently provided to Clerk. Clerk has attached to record document 1. 2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the the summons and the civil cover sheet. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7.(mm) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Manson Construction Co. (mm) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SEAMAN COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by David Mills. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney David Patrick Daniel, Jr added to party David Mills(pty:pla).(Daniel, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/6/2020) (mm). Modified text on 4/6/2020 (mm). (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.