This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:24:15 (UTC).

MILLS v. DIRECTOR OF TOLER HOUSE

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MILLS filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against DIRECTOR OF TOLER HOUSE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judge overseeing this case is Esther Salas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-21088

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Esther Salas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROBERT MILLS

Newark, NJ 07114

Respondent

DIRECTOR OF TOLER HOUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE US ATTORNEY

402 East State Street, Suite 430

Trenton, NJ 08608

JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

402 E. State Street, Room 430

Trenton, NJ 08608

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Memorandum

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK on behalf of DIRECTOR OF TOLER HOUSE (BASIAK, JOHN) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER, the Clerk shall serve a copy of the Petition (D.E. No. #1 ) and this Order upon Respondent by regular mail, etc. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Petition (D.E. No. #1 ) and this Order to the Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office at USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov. Within forty-five (45) days of the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall file and serve an answer which responds to the allegations and grounds in the Petition and which includes all affirmative defenses Respondent seeks to invoke, Respondent shall file and serve with the answer certified copies of all documents necessary to resolve Petitioner's claims and affirmative defenses. Within thirty (30) days of receipt of the answer, Petitioner may file a reply to the answer, Within seven (7) days of the Petitioner's release, be it parole or otherwise, respondent shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk. The Clerk shall serve this Order on Petitioner by regular U.S. mail (n/m). Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/9/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW041256.), filed by ROBERT MILLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memorandum, #3 Attachments)(qa, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Attachments

4 #1

Declaration of Angela Kelly

4 #2

Declaration Robin Summers

1 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DIRECTOR OF TOLER HOUSE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angela Kelly, #2 Declaration Robin Summers, #3 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

4 #3

Certificate of Service

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by ROBERT MILLS (dam, ) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address by ROBERT MILLS (dam, ) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by DIRECTOR OF TOLER HOUSE. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angela Kelly, #2 Declaration Robin Summers, #3 Certificate of Service)(BASIAK, JOHN) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN FRANCIS BASIAK on behalf of DIRECTOR OF TOLER HOUSE (BASIAK, JOHN) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER, the Clerk shall serve a copy of the Petition (D.E. No. #1 ) and this Order upon Respondent by regular mail, etc. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Petition (D.E. No. #1 ) and this Order to the Chief, Civil Division, United States Attorney's Office at USANJ-HabeasCases@usdoj.gov. Within forty-five (45) days of the date of entry of this Order, Respondent shall file and serve an answer which responds to the allegations and grounds in the Petition and which includes all affirmative defenses Respondent seeks to invoke, Respondent shall file and serve with the answer certified copies of all documents necessary to resolve Petitioner's claims and affirmative defenses. Within thirty (30) days of receipt of the answer, Petitioner may file a reply to the answer, Within seven (7) days of the Petitioner's release, be it parole or otherwise, respondent shall electronically file a written notice of the same with the Clerk. The Clerk shall serve this Order on Petitioner by regular U.S. mail (n/m). Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 12/9/2019. (ams, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number NEW041256.), filed by ROBERT MILLS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memorandum, #3 Attachments)(qa, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.