This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:12:03 (UTC).

Mills v. CSAA General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Mills filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CSAA General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00479

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Mills

Defendant

CSAA General Insurance Company doing business as AAA Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Maxwell Deane

Attorney at Deane & Panagopoulos Law PLLC

6226 E 101St Sttulsa, Ok

74137, ST 100

Dimitrios Panagopoulos

Attorney at Deane & Panagopoulos Law PLLC

6226 E 101St Streetste 100

Tulsa, OK 74137

Defendant Attorneys

James Newton Edmonds

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

Wynoka Middleton McClellan

Attorney at Atkinson Haskins Nellis Brittingham Gladd & Fiasco

525 S Main Ste 1500

Tulsa, OK 74103-4524

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) by Anthony Mills ; (With attachments) (Panagopoulos, Dimitrios) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#14

(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

13 #1

Exhibit 1 - Policy

#13

(#13) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CSAA General Insurance Company (With attachments) (McClellan, Wynoka) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/13/2021) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#8

(#8) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Parties of Removal by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

2 #7

Exhibit state court docket sheet

2 #5

Exhibit Homeowners Policy Declarations, p.1,

2 #3

Exhibit Summons

2 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition for Declaratory Action

2 #1

Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CV-2021-01713 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2509429) by CSAA General Insurance Company (With attachments) (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) by Anthony Mills ; (With attachments) (Panagopoulos, Dimitrios) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering the scheduling order. If necessary, a scheduling order will be entered after ruling on the pending motion to for judgment on the pleadings (Dkt. # 13). (Re: #14 Joint Status Report per LCvR16-1(b)(1), #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , : Counsel for defendant CSAA General Insurance Company is directed to provide, forthwith and in a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court, a paper copy of the document and/or exhibit(s) as filed at Dkt. #13 . Said paper copy shall be a COMPLETE and EXACT duplicate of the filing AFTER it is filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. Counsel shall not reorganize the filing or insert other separately docketed items. If a copy of a sealed item is ordered by the Court, then said copy shall be a separate and complete submission. (Re: #13 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CSAA General Insurance Company (With attachments) (McClellan, Wynoka) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dimitrios Panagopoulos on behalf of Anthony Mills [Note: Attorney Dimitrios Panagopoulos added to party Anthony Mills(pty:pla).] (Panagopoulos, Dimitrios) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/13/2021) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Wynoka Middleton McClellan on behalf of CSAA General Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Wynoka Middleton McClellan added to party CSAA General Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (McClellan, Wynoka) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing CSAA General Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Parties of Removal by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CV-2021-01713 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2509429) by CSAA General Insurance Company (With attachments) (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by CSAA General Insurance Company (Edmonds, James) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against CSAA General Insurance Company by Anthony Mills (bjb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wynoka Middleton McClellan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Newton Edmonds