Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 12:11:27 (UTC).

Mills et al v. United Airlines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Mills filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against United Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01241

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Levi C. Mills

Jeremy M. Mills

April C. Webb

Kimberly F. Mills

Defendants

Antonio DeLeon

ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.

Prystal Milton

ABM Aviation, Inc.

United Airlines, Inc.

Jessica Mora

Simplicity Ground Services, LLC d/b/a Simplicity USA

Simplicity Ground Services, LLC doing business as Simplicity USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Earl Ammons

Attorney at The Ammons Law Firm LLP

3700 Montrose Blvd

Houston, TX 77006

Justin David Burrow

Attorney at The Ammons Law Firm LLP

3700 Montrose Blvd

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Marc Michael Rose

Attorney at Rose Law Group PLLC

777 Main St, Ste 600

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Patrick Joseph Comerford

Attorney at Rigby Salck Lawrence Berger Comerford

3500 Jefferson Street, Suite 330

Austin, TX 78731

Jad J Stepp

Attorney at Stepp & Sullivan PC

5300 Memorial Drive, Ste 620

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by April C. Webb. (Ammons, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by ABM Aviation, Inc., Antonio DeLeon, ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., Prystal Milton, Jessica Mora, Simplicity Ground Services, LLC, United Airlines, Inc.. (Rose, Marc) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) MOTION to Remand by Jeremy M. Mills, Kimberly F. Mills, Levi C. Mills, April C. Webb, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Ammons, Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Simplicity Ground Services, LLC, filed.(Stepp, Jad) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Airlines, Inc., filed.(Stepp, Jad) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ABM Aviation, Inc., Antonio DeLeon, Prystal Milton, Jessica Mora, filed.(Rose, Marc) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., filed.(Comerford, Patrick) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jeremy M. Mills, Kimberly F. Mills, Levi C. Mills, April C. Webb, filed.(Ammons, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., filed.(Comerford, Patrick) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hlermaadi, 4) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABM Aviation, Inc. identifying ABM Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rose, Marc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc. identifying ManaAir, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Comerford, Patrick) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Judicial District Court, case number 2020-69428 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26281269) filed by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 List of Counsel and Parties)(Comerford, Patrick) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by April C. Webb. (Ammons, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to Remand, filed by ABM Aviation, Inc., Antonio DeLeon, ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., Prystal Milton, Jessica Mora, Simplicity Ground Services, LLC, United Airlines, Inc.. (Rose, Marc) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand by Jeremy M. Mills, Kimberly F. Mills, Levi C. Mills, April C. Webb, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Ammons, Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Simplicity Ground Services, LLC, filed.(Stepp, Jad) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United Airlines, Inc., filed.(Stepp, Jad) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ABM Aviation, Inc., Antonio DeLeon, Prystal Milton, Jessica Mora, filed.(Rose, Marc) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., filed.(Comerford, Patrick) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jeremy M. Mills, Kimberly F. Mills, Levi C. Mills, April C. Webb, filed.(Ammons, Robert) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc., filed.(Comerford, Patrick) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hlermaadi, 4) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABM Aviation, Inc. identifying ABM Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Rose, Marc) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc. identifying ManaAir, LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Comerford, Patrick) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Judicial District Court, case number 2020-69428 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26281269) filed by ExpressJet Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Pleadings, #4 List of Counsel and Parties)(Comerford, Patrick) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXPRESSJET AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert E. Ammons