This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 09:03:50 (UTC).

Millette v. Gamble et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Millette filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Gamble. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel B. Toomey and Marcia Morales Howard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00924

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reynaldo Millette

Jasper, FL 32052-1360

Defendants

Officer Gamble

Sgt. Kitchen

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered August 25, 2020, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/26/2020. (RH) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/25/2020. (BL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reynaldo Millette. (KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

1 #3

Mailing Envelope

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Officer Gamble, Sgt. Kitchen filed by Reynaldo Millette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Mailing Envelope)(KEM)(No service copies provided, no payment received.) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered August 25, 2020, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/26/2020. (RH) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 8/25/2020. (BL) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Reynaldo Millette. (KEM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Officer Gamble, Sgt. Kitchen filed by Reynaldo Millette. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Mailing Envelope)(KEM)(No service copies provided, no payment received.) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less