This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:01:50 (UTC).

Miller v. Wells Fargo & Company et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Miller filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Wells Fargo Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-08327

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teddy Miller

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Wells Fargo & Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhonda Kaye Hunter Wills

Attorney at Wills Law Firm, PLLC

1776 Yorktown Suite 570

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorney

Andrew More McNaught

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

560 Mission Street, 31St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Teddy Miller.. (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

12 #1

Declaration of Michaelle Wilkie

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Teddy Miller identifying Other Affiliate Wills Law Firm, PLLC - Rhonda H. Wills for Teddy Miller. (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative Transfer Proceedings to Southern District of New York filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/20/2020. Replies due by 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michaelle Wilkie, #2 Declaration of Bailey Bifoss, #3 Proposed Order)(McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Teddy Miller DISCLOSURE OF NON-PARTY INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/31/2019) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

12 #2

Declaration of Bailey Bifoss

1 #1

Notice of Consent

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. AND CERTICIATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

1 #3

Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons

#11

(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

12 #3

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/ 17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14002046.). Filed byTeddy Miller. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons)(Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/20/2019) Modified on 12/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. for Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #13 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2020) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. AND CERTICIATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES (McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative Transfer Proceedings to Southern District of New York filed by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 2/20/2020. Replies due by 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michaelle Wilkie, #2 Declaration of Bailey Bifoss, #3 Proposed Order)(McNaught, Andrew) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/07/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2020) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Teddy Miller.. (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Teddy Miller identifying Other Affiliate Wills Law Firm, PLLC - Rhonda H. Wills for Teddy Miller. (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error.RE: #6 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Teddy Miller 1. Judge name or initials are missing/incorrect. Documents should reference the c orrect judge name/initials on future filings. The full and correct case number is: 4:19-cv-08327-KAW. 2. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Entities by Teddy Miller DISCLOSURE OF NON-PARTY INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/31/2019) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Teddy Miller.The Certificate of Interested Parties needs to be filed separately and not as an attachment to your complaint. Please re-file the document using the correct event. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) Modified on 12/26/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/ 17/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14002046.). Filed byTeddy Miller. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons)(Wills, Rhonda) (Filed on 12/20/2019) Modified on 12/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.