This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 07:26:33 (UTC).

MILLER v. WALMART INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 MILLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Sharon A. King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Sharon A. King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID MILLER

Defendants

WALMART INC.

WAL-MART STORES, INC.

WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST

JOHN DOE # 1-10

ABC CORP. #1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEREMY WEITZ

Attorney at SPEAR, GREENFIELD, RICHMAN, WEITZ & TAGGART, P.C.

1500 Jfk Blvd, Suite 200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

PATRICK J. MCDONNELL

Attorney at MCDONNELL & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

860 First Avenue, Suite 5B

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

SEAN K. RUCKENSTEIN

Attorney at McDonnell & Associates

860 First Avenue, Suite 58

King Of Prussia, PA 19406

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Letter from Sean K. Ruckenstein regarding Discovery Confidentiality Order. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#14

(#14) Letter from Local Rule 26.1 Parties' Agreement. (WEITZ, JEREMY) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/9/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 9/21/2022. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in January, 2023, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/8/2022. (amv) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#12

(#12) Joint Discovery Plan by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC..(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#11

(#11) Joint Discovery Plan by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC..(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#10

(#10) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC.. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES, INC.. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#7

No Description Available

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC. (MCDONNELL, PATRICK) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 2/8/2022 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/14/2022. (amv) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by DAVID MILLER. (WEITZ, JEREMY) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY WEITZ on behalf of DAVID MILLER (WEITZ, JEREMY) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Letter from Sean K. Ruckenstein regarding Discovery Confidentiality Order. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter from Local Rule 26.1 Parties' Agreement. (WEITZ, JEREMY) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER IN ARBITRATION CASE: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/9/2022 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Pretrial factual Discovery due by 9/21/2022. The Clerk will be requested to schedule the arbitration for a date in January, 2023, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 2/8/2022. (amv) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/8/2022 by telephone. Scheduling Order to be entered. (mb, ) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Proposed Joint Discovery Plan (ECF Nos. #11 , #12 ) submitted by Sean Ruckenstein must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with the instructions outlined in the 5 Text Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (jdb) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint Discovery Plan by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC..(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint Discovery Plan by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC..(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC.. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST identifying Walmart Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART STORES, INC.. (RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK J. MCDONNELL on behalf of WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC. (MCDONNELL, PATRICK) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on February 8, 2022 at 11:30 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be submitted via email to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/14/22. (mb, ) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (amv) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 2/8/2022 11:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 1/14/2022. (amv) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (amv) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Jury Demand, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (amv) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketJudge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. (dmw) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by DAVID MILLER. (WEITZ, JEREMY) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY WEITZ on behalf of DAVID MILLER (WEITZ, JEREMY) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Camden County, case number CAM-L-001917-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13111212), filed by WAL-MART REAL ESTATE BUSINESS TRUST, WAL-MART STORES, INC., WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(RUCKENSTEIN, SEAN) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant