This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2021 at 08:51:45 (UTC).

Miller v. Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Miller filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee Yeakel and James R. Nowlin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00204

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lee Yeakel

James R. Nowlin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marlin Shawn Miller

Defendant

Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel S. Shields

Attorney at Scanes & Routh, LLP

7901 Fish Pond Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 20965

Waco, TX 76702

Michael L. Scanes

Attorney at Scanes & Routh, LLP

7901 Fish Pond Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 20965

Waco, TX 76702-0965

Defendant Attorney

Drew L. Harris

Attorney at Assistant Attorney General

300 W. 15Th Street, 11Th Floor

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 12/17/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings/Join Parties due by 8/13/2021, Discovery due by 12/10/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2021, Motions due by 1/7/2022, Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge James R. Nowlin. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (lt) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#7

(#7) Proposed Scheduling Order by Marlin Shawn Miller. (Shields, Joel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING this cause to the Austin Docket of the Honorable James Nowlin, Senior United States District Judge, for all purposes. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Drew L. Harris added to party Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission(pty:dft) by Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission.(Harris, Drew) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlin Shawn Miller. Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Shields, Joel) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission. (cj) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Marlin Shawn Miller. (Shields, Joel) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 3/3/2021) (cj). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14550899), filed by Marlin Shawn Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Joel) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 12/17/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings/Join Parties due by 8/13/2021, Discovery due by 12/10/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2021, Motions due by 1/7/2022, Jury Trial set for 2/28/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge James R. Nowlin. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (lt) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Scheduling Order by Marlin Shawn Miller. (Shields, Joel) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING this cause to the Austin Docket of the Honorable James Nowlin, Senior United States District Judge, for all purposes. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Drew L. Harris added to party Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission(pty:dft) by Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission.(Harris, Drew) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marlin Shawn Miller. Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission served on 3/5/2021, answer due 3/26/2021. (Shields, Joel) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Texas Alcoholic Beverage Commission. (cj) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Marlin Shawn Miller. (cj) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Marlin Shawn Miller. (Shields, Joel) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 3/3/2021) (cj). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14550899), filed by Marlin Shawn Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Joel) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drew L Harris