This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2022 at 07:19:52 (UTC).

Miller v. Red Robin International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2022 Miller filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Red Robin International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02574

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

steven Miller

Defendant

Red Robin International, Inc. doing business as Red Robin Burger and Spirits Emporiums

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca Peterson-Fisher

Attorney at The Liu Law Firm, PC

Suite 200, 800 Menlo Park Avenue

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jennifer Lin Liu

Attorney at The Liu Law Firm, P.C.

800 Menlo Ave Ste 102

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/29/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Peterson-Fisher, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Red Robin International, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Miller.. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steven Miller. Service waived by Red Robin International, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Peterson-Fisher, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/24/2022) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Steven Miller. Service waived by Red Robin International, Inc. waiver sent on 6/13/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Peterson-Fisher, Rebecca) (Filed on 6/24/2022) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Steven Miller.. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/11/2022) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Red Robin International, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Peterson-Fisher, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/3/2022) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/29/202 2. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. The summons should be uploaded separately and not as part of, or as an attachment to, the complaint or other initiatin g documents. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office as to Summons Only.Please re-file in its entirety as Proposed Summons. Re:[1-1] Summons filed by Steven Miller (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/11/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Red Robin International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17126805.). Filed bysteven Miller. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peterson-Fisher, Rebecca) (Filed on 4/27/2022) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Lin Liu