This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 08:13:33 (UTC).

Miller v. Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Miller filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra M. Brown and Jane M. Virden. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeremy G. Miller

Clarksdale, MS 38614

Defendant

Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Amanda Green Alexander

Attorney at ALEXANDER LAW

P.O. Box 1664

Jackson, MS 39215-1664

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by Jeremy G. Miller. (tab)

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) CONSENT & REGISTRATION form to receive documents electronically (tab)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to issue process and USM to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/28/22. (jla)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc.; forwarded to USM for service. (jla)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. served on 3/14/2022. (tab)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Green Alexander on behalf of Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. (Alexander, Amanda)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Green Alexander on behalf of Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. (Alexander, Amanda)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc. served on 3/14/2022. (tab)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Pioneer Hi-Bred International Inc.; forwarded to USM for service. (jla)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to issue process and USM to serve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/28/22. (jla)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT & REGISTRATION form to receive documents electronically (tab)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy G. Miller. (tab)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by Jeremy G. Miller. (tab)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pioneer Hi-Bred International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda Green Alexander