This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 09:03:59 (UTC).

MILLER v. PV IMPORTS, INC. D/B/A PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 MILLER filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against PV IMPORTS, INC D/B/A PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04477

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Miller

Defendants

PIAZZA AUTO GROUP

PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERNANDO I. RIVERA

Attorney at CONSOLE MATTIACCI LAW, LLC

1525 Locust Street, 9Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

SUSAN SMITH LLOYD

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. HENDRZAK

3773 Corporate Center Parkway, Suite 180

Center Valley, PA 18034

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Miller. PIAZZA AUTO GROUP waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Miller. PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss filed by PIAZZA AUTO GROUP, PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA..(LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#5

(#5) Memorandum of Law in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PIAZZA AUTO GROUP, PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA. (LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by David Miller.(RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 11/23/21.11/23/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by PIAZZA AUTO GROUP, PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA.(LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT EACH PARTY MUST, WITHOUT AWAITING DISCOVERY REQUEST, PROVIDE THE DISCLOSURES CONTEMPLATED BY RULE 26 (a) TO ANY OTHER PARTIES WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE PARTIES SHALL COMMENCE DISCOVERY IMMEDIATELY AND THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A WRITTEN JOINT REPORT OF THEIR RULE 26 (f)MEETING BY NO LATER THAN 1/4/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/8/21. 12/8/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT EACH PARTY MUST, WITHOUT AWAITING DISCOVERY REQUEST, PROVIDE THE DISCLOSURES CONTEMPLATED BY RULE 26 (a) TO ANY OTHER PARTIES WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THE PARTIES SHALL COMMENCE DISCOVERY IMMEDIATELY AND THE PARTIES SHALL FILE A WRITTEN JOINT REPORT OF THEIR RULE 26 (f)MEETING BY NO LATER THAN 1/4/22; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 12/8/21. 12/8/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by PIAZZA AUTO GROUP, PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA.(LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 11/23/21.11/23/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by David Miller.(RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Memorandum of Law in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PIAZZA AUTO GROUP, PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA. (LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss filed by PIAZZA AUTO GROUP, PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA..(LLOYD, SUSAN) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Miller. PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Miller. PIAZZA AUTO GROUP waiver sent on 10/15/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. (RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to PIAZZA AUTO GROUP, PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/13/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by David Miller. (JL ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PIAZZA AUTO GROUP, PV IMPORTS, INC. d/b/a PIAZZA HONDA OF PHILADELPHIA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15469605.), filed by David Miller.(RIVERA, FERNANDO) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Susan Smith Lloyd