This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2020 at 08:11:06 (UTC).

Miller v. Mediacom LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Miller filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mediacom LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry F. Moorer and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry F. Moorer

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Lynn Miller

Defendants

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Mediacom LLC

Bigham Cable Construction, Inc.

Mediacom Southeast LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jon David Roberts, Jr.

Attorney at Citrin Law Firm, PC

Post Office Box 2187

Daphne, AL 36526

Defendant Attorneys

Brett A. Ross

Attorney at Carr, Allison

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

Jeffrey Garrett Miller

Attorney at Carr, Allison

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 35216

Beth Lee Liles

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie LLP

P.O. Box 1548

Mobile, AL 36633-1548

M. Warren Butler

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie LLP

P. O. Box 1548

Mobile, AL 36633-1548

Sara Elizabeth Liles

Attorney at Starnes Davis Florie

P.O. Box 1548

Mobile, AL 36633

Michael C. Niemeyer

Attorney at Hand Arendall

P.O. Box 1499

Fairhope, AL 36533

 

Court Documents

27 #1

Standing Pretrial Order

#27

(#27) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Motion to amended pleadings due by 8/3/2020. Discovery cutoff 2/19/2021. Dispositive motions due by 3/12/2021. Jury Selection set for 8/31/2021 at 8:45 AM in US Courthouse, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602. Jury Trial set for the September 2021 term in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Terry F. Moorer. ETT 2 days. Position Regarding Settlement due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (srd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#26

(#26) Order GRANTING #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Complaint filed by Jerry Lynn Miller. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file its amended complaint by 5/28/2020 as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 05/21/2020. (srd) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#24

(#24) NOTICE by Bigham Cable Construction, Inc. of Filing Initial Disclosures (Niemeyer, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#23

(#23) NOTICE by Jerry Lynn Miller of Service of P's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Roberts, Jon) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#22

(#22) Notice of Filing Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Mediacom LLC, Mediacom Southeast LLC. (Liles, Sara) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Amend Complaint filed by Jerry Lynn Miller. (Roberts, Jon) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

#20

(#20) Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference, re: #18 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Jerry Lynn Miller. Scheduling Conference set by telephone for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/13/2020. (mab) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#18

(#20) Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference, re: #18 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Jerry Lynn Miller. Scheduling Conference set by telephone for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/13/2020. (mab) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mediacom LLC, Mediacom Southeast LLC. (Butler, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit 6 - FL SoS Entity Detail - Bigham Cable Construction, Inc.

1 #6

Exhibit 5 - OH SoS Entity Detail - United Parcel Service, Inc

1 #5

Exhibit 4- NY SoS Entity Detail - MEDIACOM LLC

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - Circuit Court Filings

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Settlement Demand

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) NOTICE by Mediacom LLC, Mediacom Southeast LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Butler, M.) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Terry F. Moorer. Motion to amended pleadings due by 8/3/2020. Discovery cutoff 2/19/2021. Dispositive motions due by 3/12/2021. Jury Selection set for 8/31/2021 at 8:45 AM in US Courthouse, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602. Jury Trial set for the September 2021 term in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3B, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before District Judge Terry F. Moorer. ETT 2 days. Position Regarding Settlement due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 05/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order) (srd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Order GRANTING #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amend Complaint filed by Jerry Lynn Miller. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file its amended complaint by 5/28/2020 as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 05/21/2020. (srd) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/21/2020. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (clr) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE by Bigham Cable Construction, Inc. of Filing Initial Disclosures (Niemeyer, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE by Jerry Lynn Miller of Service of P's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Roberts, Jon) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREFERRAL OF #21 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Judge Moorer. (tot) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Filing Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Mediacom LLC, Mediacom Southeast LLC. (Liles, Sara) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Amend Complaint filed by Jerry Lynn Miller. (Roberts, Jon) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Order Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference, re: #18 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Jerry Lynn Miller. Scheduling Conference set by telephone for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Judge's Chambers, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 5/13/2020. (mab) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Order re: #17 Amended Complaint filed by Jerry Lynn Miller. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he is ORDERED to file a motion for leave to amend his complaint or an indication of Defendants' consent. If Plaintiff intends to reply upon consent, it must be filed on or before May 20, 2020, otherwise the document entitled First Amended Complaint will be stricken from the docket sheet by separate order. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 5/13/2020. (mab) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Mediacom LLC, Mediacom Southeast LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Butler, M.) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants United Parcel Service, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for United Parcel Service, Inc... (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Miller, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Blank Disclosure Statement e-mailed to Defendants Bigham Cable Construction, Inc., and United Parcel Service, Inc.; Disclosure Statements Due 4/2/2020. (mab) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketAnswers due from Bigham Cable Construction, Inc. and United Parcel Service, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 81(c). (mab) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Mediacom LLC, Mediacom Southeast LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant Bigham Cable Construction, Inc.'s Consent to Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.'s Consent to Removal) (Butler, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Mediacom Southeast LLC. (Butler, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Mediacom LLC. (Butler, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mediacom LLC, Mediacom Southeast LLC. (Butler, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2592963, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Mediacom Southeast LLC, Mediacom LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Demand, #4 Exhibit 3 - Circuit Court Filings, #5 Exhibit 4- NY SoS Entity Detail - MEDIACOM LLC, #6 Exhibit 5 - OH SoS Entity Detail - United Parcel Service, Inc, #7 Exhibit 6 - FL SoS Entity Detail - Bigham Cable Construction, Inc.) (Butler, M.) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDIACOM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon David Roberts, Jr.