This case was last updated from PACER on 10/04/2020 at 09:07:59 (UTC).

Miller v. Kaylor

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Miller filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kaylor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stacie F. Beckerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01308

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stacie F. Beckerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Rickie Miller

Eugene, OR 97401

Rickie A. Miller

Eugene, OR 97401

Defendant

Kinsey Kaylor

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Motion for Subpoena. Filed by Rickie A. Miller. (joha) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/5/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Rickie Miller against Kinsey Kaylor. (dsg) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#1

(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Rickie Miller. (dsg) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Subpoena. Filed by Rickie A. Miller. (joha) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/5/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Rickie Miller against Kinsey Kaylor. (dsg) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Rickie Miller. (dsg) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less