Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2020 at 08:01:34 (UTC).

Ayers v. Great Meadow CF

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 Ayers filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Great Meadow CF. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Therese Wiley Dancks and Glenn T. Suddaby. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

Presiding Judge

Glenn T. Suddaby

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Richard Miller

Fallsburg, NY 12733

Christopher L. Ayers

Fallsburg, NY 12733

Great Meadow CF

Shannon Stevens

Melissa Collins

Lt. Scarlotta

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Letter from Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#12

(#12) RULE 11 AFFIDAVIT by Christopher L. Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#11

(#11) INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Christopher L. Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher L. Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#9

(#9) Submission from Ayers of state court forms. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#8

(#8) Letter from Ayers requesting forms. Forms provided. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#7

(#7) Submission from Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's IFP Application (Dkt. No. #1 ) is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall amend the docket as follows: (1) substitute "Christopher L. Ayers" for "Richard Miller" as Plaintiff herein; and (2) add the following individuals as defendants: (a) Lt. Scarlotta; (b) Richard Miller; (c) Melissa Collins; and (d) Shannon Stevens. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if Plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order (1) either (a) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application and inmate authorization form; and (2) execute and file an affidavit pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/26/2020. {order served via regular mail on Ayers}(nas) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00112. electronically transferred when case opened (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#4

(#4) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/8/2020) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#3

(#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Richard Miller.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Great Meadow CF. Document filed by Richard Miller.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Richard Miller.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter from Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/5/2020. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 11 AFFIDAVIT by Christopher L. Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Christopher L. Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Christopher L. Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submission from Ayers of state court forms. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter from Ayers requesting forms. Forms provided. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submission from Ayers. (nas, ) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: ORDERED that Plaintiff's IFP Application (Dkt. No. #1 ) is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall amend the docket as follows: (1) substitute "Christopher L. Ayers" for "Richard Miller" as Plaintiff herein; and (2) add the following individuals as defendants: (a) Lt. Scarlotta; (b) Richard Miller; (c) Melissa Collins; and (d) Shannon Stevens. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if Plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order (1) either (a) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application and inmate authorization form; and (2) execute and file an affidavit pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/26/2020. {order served via regular mail on Ayers}(nas) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-00112. electronically transferred when case opened (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #4 Order, to Richard Miller 97-A-1552 Sullivan Correctional Facility P.O. Box 116 Fallsburg, NY 12733-0116. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/8/2020) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Richard Miller.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Great Meadow CF. Document filed by Richard Miller.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Richard Miller.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/15/2020.] (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less