This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/27/2023 at 22:04:18 (UTC).

Miller v. Davidson Homes LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Miller filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Davidson Homes LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Liles C Burke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liles C Burke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mike Miller

Defendants

Davidson Homes LLC

Davidson Home Group LLC

Elite Housing Management

Chad Conner

Dee Ellis

Lou B. Paratore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard Allan Rice

Johnathan Fitzgerald Austin

Roderick Van Daniel

Defendant Attorneys

James A Kee, Jr

Stephanie L Weems

Christopher Lea Lockwood

Richard R Raleigh, Jr

Kendall Lauren Fann

Neal D Moore, III

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) MOTION to Dismiss by Chad Conner, Elite Housing Management. (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#39

(#39) MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Rulings on Motions to Dismiss by Chad Conner, Elite Housing Management. (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#38

(#38) REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Chad Conner, Elite Housing Management. (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#37

(#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mike Miller. (Rice, Richard) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#35

(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ELITE HOUSING MANAGEMENT AND CHAD CONNOR'S INITIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Mike Miller. (Rice, Richard) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#34

(#34) RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Mike Miller. (Rice, Richard) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#33

(#33) Amended MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Davidson Homes LLC. (Kee, James) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#31

(#31) ORDER: The Court GRANS defendants' #25 request to refile their Motion to Dismiss; Motion shall be refiled within 7 days from the entry date of this or or by 11/21/2022; plaintiff's response is due within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/14/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#29

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

(#31) ORDER: The Court GRANS defendants' #25 request to refile their Motion to Dismiss; Motion shall be refiled within 7 days from the entry date of this or or by 11/21/2022; plaintiff's response is due within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/14/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#24

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/12/2023

Docket(#40) TEXT ORDER granting (39) Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines. The deadlines laid out in the Court's (19) Scheduling Order shall be stayed until the Court rules on Parties Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/12/2023. (AHI) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#39) MOTION to Stay Deadlines Pending Rulings on Motions to Dismiss by Chad Conner, Elite Housing Management. (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#38) REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Chad Conner, Elite Housing Management. (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mike Miller. (Rice, Richard) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022

Docket(#36) TEXT ORDER granting (35) Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have an additional seven days, or until December 5, 2022, to file its Response to Defendants Elite Housing Management and Chad Connors Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/29/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS ELITE HOUSING MANAGEMENT AND CHAD CONNOR'S INITIAL MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT by Mike Miller. (Rice, Richard) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#34) RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Mike Miller. (Rice, Richard) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#33) Amended MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Davidson Homes LLC. (Kee, James) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#32) MOTION to Dismiss by Chad Conner, Elite Housing Management. (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#31) ORDER: The Court GRANS defendants' #25 request to refile their Motion to Dismiss; Motion shall be refiled within 7 days from the entry date of this or or by 11/21/2022; plaintiff's response is due within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 11/14/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
03/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R Raleigh, Jr on behalf of Davidson Home Group LLC, Davidson Homes LLC, Dee Ellis, Lou B. Paratore (Raleigh, Richard) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Davidson Homes LLC (Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Davidson Home Group LLC (Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Davidson Home Group LLC, Davidson Homes LLC, Dee Ellis, Lou B. Paratore. (Lockwood, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mike Miller. Bakers Farm Homeowners Association Inc served with no date on green card. (BJL) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mike Miller. Davidson Home Group LLC served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022; Davidson Homes LLC served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022; Dee Ellis served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022; Lou B. Paratore served on 2/25/2022, answer due 3/18/2022. (AHI) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered by certified mail for service as to Bakers Farm Homeowners Association Inc, Chad Conner, Davidson Home Group LLC, Davidson Homes LLC, Elite Housing Management, Dee Ellis, and Lou B. Paratore. (AHI) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for service by certified mail in the #1 Complaint filed by Mike Miller. (AHI) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-398966 B4601117791). related document #1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Mike Miller.(AHI). (Rice, Richard) Modified on 1/7/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 01/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/03/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Mike Miller.(AHI) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less