This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2020 at 07:18:01 (UTC).

Miller v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Miller filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Shon T. Erwin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01125

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shon T. Erwin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Valerie Miller

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miles L Mitzner

Attorney at Mitzner Law Firm

809 East 33Rd St

Edmond, OK 73013

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Valerie Miller. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 12/16/2019. (Mitzner, Miles) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (kmt) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Miles L Mitzner on behalf of Valerie Miller (Mitzner, Miles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3047421. (Mitzner, Miles) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Valerie Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.