This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:26:26 (UTC).

Miller v. Coleman Professional Services, et al.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Miller filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Coleman Professional Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John R. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02832

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John R. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chadwick L. Miller

Canton, OH 44708

Defendants

Coleman Professional Services

Jackson Police Department

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Coleman Professional Services, Jackson Police Department. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Chadwick L. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285) (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 #1

Affidavit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Chadwick L. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

USM-285

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOnly one Summons provided for two Defendants. Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #1 Complaint mailed to Chadwick L. Miller at 6421 Groton Street, Canton, OH 44708 on 12/6/19. Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Chadwick L. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Coleman Professional Services, Jackson Police Department. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Chadwick L. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285) (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.