Miller v. City of Manassas Park et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with Jury Demand against City of Manassas Park, et al. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7724800.), filed by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05, #6 Exhibit 06, #7 Exhibit 07, #8 Exhibit 08, #9 Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Findley, Clyde) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons to City of Manassas Park by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons to Mario Lugo by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons to Frank Winston by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons to Trevor Reinhart by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons to Carl Dorr by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons to Laszlo Palko by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regan Miller as to City of Manassas Park served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021 (Findley, Clyde) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regan Miller as to Mario Lugo served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021 (Findley, Clyde) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regan Miller as to Trevor Reinhart served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021 (Findley, Clyde) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regan Miller as to Frank Winston served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021 (Findley, Clyde) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regan Miller as to Carl Dorr served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021 (Findley, Clyde) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regan Miller as to Laszlo Palko served on 4/23/2021, answer due 5/14/2021 (Findley, Clyde) Modified text on 4/27/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Kathleen Bardot on behalf of City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,, by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER that defendants' #17 Motion for Extension of time until May 31, 2021 to file responsive pleadings to plaintiff's complaint shall be and hereby is granted. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/6/21. (klau, ) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) Modified on 6/1/2021 Document filed in error and refiled corrected document as dkt. no. 22 per counsel (klau, ). Modified on 6/2/2021 Strike per Order dated 6/2/21 (klau, ). (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Bardot, Heather) Modified on 6/1/2021 Document filed in error and refiled corrected document as dkt. no. 23 per counsel (klau, ). Modified on 6/2/2021 Strike pre Order dated 6/2/21 (klau, ). (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Notice of Hearing Date set for 8/6/21 re #20 Memorandum in Support, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Bardot, Heather) Modified on 6/1/2021 Document filed in error and refiled corrected document as dkt. no. 24 per counsel (klau, ). Modified on 6/2/2021 Strike per Order 6/2/21 (klau, ). (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Hearing Date set for 8/6/21 re #23 Memorandum in Support, #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 05/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 8/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Withdrawal of Motion by All Defendants re #21 Notice of Hearing Date, #20 Memorandum in Support, #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER re #25 Withdrawal of Motion filed by Mario Lugo, Trevor Reinhart, City of Manassas Park, Laszlo Palko, Carl Dorr, Frank Winston ORDERED that the court hereby strikes ECF Nos. 19, 20 and 21. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/2/21. (klau, ) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Memorandum in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Reply to #27 Memorandum in Opposition filed by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Lee Antolic on behalf of City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston (Antolic, Nicole) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Stay of Expungement by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Memorandum in Support re #30 MOTION to Stay of Expungement filed by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Notice of Hearing Date re #30 MOTION to Stay of Expungement, #31 Memorandum in Support, (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Smith on behalf of Regan Miller (Smith, Andrew) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #30 MOTION to Stay of Expungement. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, ) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 8/6/2021. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status. Motions argued. Defts' #30 MOTION to Stay of Expungementis GRANTED. Defts #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. (orders to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER:THIS MATTER is before the court on motion of Defendants, City of Manassas Park, Mario Lugo, Frank Winston, Trevor Reinhart, Carl Dorr and Laszlo Palko, by counsel, for entry of an order directing preservation of all electronically stored information, copies and backup, as defined by Rule 34 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, along with any paper files until the conclusion of the present action and after the time period for all appeals have passed; and it appearing to the court that the motion should be granted for the reasons set forth in the Motion and Memorandum in Support thereof; it is ORDERED that defendants are directed to preserve all electronically stored information, copies and backup, as defined by Rule 34 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, along with any paper filesuntil the conclusion of the present action and after the time period for all appeals have passed. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/6/21. (yguy) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Dkt. No. 22] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and it is hereby ORDERED that all counts be and are DISMISSED as to the City of Manassas Park; Count II be and is DISMISSED as to all defendants; Counts I and IV be and are DISMISSED as to defendants Dorr, Palko, and the City of Manassas Park; Count VII be and is DISMISSED as to defendants Lugo, Reinhart, Winston, Palko, and the City of Manassas Park; Count VIII be and is DISMISSED as to defendant Dorr and the City of Manassas Park. Based on plaintiffs withdrawal, Counts III, V, and VI be and are DISMISSED as to all defendants. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/6/21. (yguy) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2021 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/6/21. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Withdrawal of Motion by All Defendants re #30 MOTION to Stay of Expungement, #31 Memorandum in Support, (Antolic, Nicole) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Joint Discovery Plan by Regan Miller.(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - This matter comes before the Court on the parties Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #39 ). Based on the parties representations in their discovery plan, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 25, 2021 shall be canceled. Upon review of the pleadings and the record, the court makes the following rulings:1. The Rule 26(f) report (Dkt. No. #39 ) filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 8/18/2021. (lcre, ) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston.(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Consent MOTION for Protective Order by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Waiver of re #42 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Antolic, Nicole) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nicole Lee Antolic terminated. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/23/2021. (nneb) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION for Protective Order (amended per request from chambers - see paragraph 7) by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Waiver of re #46 MOTION for Protective Order (amended per request from chambers - see paragraph 7) Waiver of Hearing by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION to Quash plaintiff's subpoena to Calvert County Sheriff's Office by Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Memorandum in Support re #48 MOTION to Quash plaintiff's subpoena to Calvert County Sheriff's Office filed by Frank Winston. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Notice of Hearing Date 10/29/21 re #48 MOTION to Quash plaintiff's subpoena to Calvert County Sheriff's Office, #49 Memorandum in Support (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #48 MOTION to Quash plaintiff's subpoena to Calvert County Sheriff's Office. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (clar, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #48 MOTION to Quash plaintiff's subpoena to Calvert County Sheriff's Office (clar, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Amended PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 9/28/2021. (lcre, ) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION to Quash by Trevor Reinhart. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Memorandum in Support re #51 MOTION to Quash filed by Trevor Reinhart. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Notice of Hearing Date re #51 MOTION to Quash , #52 Memorandum in Support (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #51 MOTION to Quash . Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (clar, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #51 MOTION to Quash (clar, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) MOTION to Quash by Carl Dorr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Memorandum in Support re #55 MOTION to Quash filed by Carl Dorr. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Notice of Hearing Date re #56 Memorandum in Support, #55 MOTION to Quash (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MOTION to Quash subpoena to Montgomery County Police Department by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) Memorandum in Support re #58 MOTION to Quash subpoena to Montgomery County Police Department filed by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Notice of Hearing Date set for 10/29/21 re #59 Memorandum in Support, #58 MOTION to Quash subpoena to Montgomery County Police Department (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #55 MOTION to Quash , #58 MOTION to Quash subpoena to Montgomery County Police Department. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (clar, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Nachmanoff. #55 MOTION to Quash , #58 MOTION to Quash subpoena to Montgomery County Police Department (clar, ) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE by Regan Miller re #48 MOTION to Quash plaintiff's subpoena to Calvert County Sheriff's Office of Withdrawal of Subpoena (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE by Regan Miller re #55 MOTION to Quash of Withdrawal of Subpoena (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) NOTICE by Regan Miller re #51 MOTION to Quash of Withdrawal of Subpoena (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) Memorandum in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Quash subpoena to Montgomery County Police Department filed by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston re #60 Notice of Hearing Date, #64 Memorandum in Opposition, #59 Memorandum in Support, #58 MOTION to Quash subpoena to Montgomery County Police Department Notice to Court Re: Motion to Quash [ECF No. 58] and Request for Entry of Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) Agreed Order Resolving #58 Motion to Quash (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/18/2021. (kgall) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketPer MSN chambers motions[48 & 51 & 55] set for 10/29/2021 have been withdrawn (clar, ) Modified test on 10/26/2021 (clar, ). (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Consent MOTION for Discovery Request Entry of Order by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) Waiver of re #67 Consent MOTION for Discovery Request Entry of Order Waiver of Hearing by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Magistrate Judge Michael S. (MJ)Nachmanoff no longer assigned to the case. (jlan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Memorandum in Support re #69 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Waiver of re #69 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , #70 Memorandum in Support by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDERED that the court's Scheduling Order [ECF No. 37] is modified such that discovery is extended through December 31, 2021, and the Final Pretrial Conference is continued until January 20, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The deadlines for the parties' final pretrial filings/disclosures, and objections thereto, shall be calculated off of the new Final Pretrial Conference date set forth herein. All other deadlines previously imposed by the court remain in full force and effect (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/9/2021. (nneb, ) Modified on 12/16/2021 (nneb, ). (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER denying as moot #67 Consent MOTION for Discovery Request Entry of Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 12/10/2021. (dest) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NOTICE by City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDERED that the time of the final pretrial conference be and is ADVANCED to 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, January 20, 2022 (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/18/2022. (nneb) Modified on 1/19/2022 (nneb, ). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketReset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (nneb) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) Rule 26 Disclosure by Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Rule 26 Disclosure by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit C - Depo Designations)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/20/2022:. Appearances of counsel. Parties have filed/exchanged exhibits/witness lists. Summary Judgment Hearing set for 3/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Trial estimate - 5 days. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (Court Reporter S. Austin.)(yguy) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) Objection to #77 Rule 26 Disclosure -Plaintiff's List of Deposition Designations- filed by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 01/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Objection to #77 Rule 26 Disclosure - PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST- filed by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 01/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Objection to #76 Rule 26 Disclosure by Defendants filed by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Waiver of re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages WAIVER OF HEARING by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston (Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) Opposition to #82 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) Waiver of re #82 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Regan Miller (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ORDER denying #82 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that defendants shall submit all briefs for their Motion for Summary Judgment pursuant to the page limits in Local Rule 7(F)(3). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 02/10/2022. (dvanm) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#88) Memorandum in Support re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Catherine Miller Transcript, #2 Exhibit Carl Dorr Transcript, #3 Exhibit Ed Nuttall Transcript, #4 Exhibit Lugo Transcript, #5 Exhibit Nancy Climaco Transcript, #6 Exhibit Palko Transcript, #7 Exhibit Regan Miller Transcript (11/17/22), #8 Exhibit Regan Miller Transcript (12/6/22), #9 Exhibit Reinhart Transcript, #10 Exhibit Winton Transcript, #11 Affidavit Dingler, #12 Affidavit Dorr, #13 Affidavit Lugo, #14 Affidavit Reinhart)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 02/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less