This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2022 at 13:52:02 (UTC).

Miller v. City of Manassas Park et al

Case Summary

On April 14, 2021, Regan Miller (“Officer Miller” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Andrew Joseph Smith and Clyde Elbert Findley of Berenzweig Leonard LLP, filed a civil rights complaint against City of Manassas Park, Virginia (“Defendant Manassas Park”), Mario Lugo (“Defendant Lugo”), Frank Winston (“Defendant Winston”), Trevor Reinhart (“Defendant Reinhart”), Carl Dorr (“Defendant Dorr”), and Laszlo Palko (“Defendant Palko,”) (collectively, “Defendants”), represented by Heather Kathleen Bardot of McGavin, Boyce, Bardot, Thorsen & Katz, P.C. and Nicole Lee Antolic of London Amburn, seeking compensatory damages in an amount no less than $990,263.01, treble damages in accordance with VA. CODE § 18.2-500, punitive damages in the amount of no less than $2,500,000.00 and other reliefs for alleged actions of the City of Manassas Park and those participating individuals named as Defendants. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Western District of Virginia with Judges Michael S. Nachmanoff Leonie M. Brinkema presiding.

 

In the complaint the Plaintiff alleged that “Plaintiff Regan Miller was hired by MPPD in June 2007 to serve as a sworn law enforcement officer.” And that during his service, there were several incidents and retaliatory acts directed at Officer Miller.

 

The Plaintiff further alleged that “As a result of the open and continuous threats of retaliation, including additional discipline, demotion, deception, coercion, emotional harm, and unbearable treatment, suffered at the hands of Defendants, and the refusal to resume Officer Miller’s appeal related to the findings in the City Letter, Officer Miller was forced to resign on July 20, 2020.”

 

The Plaintiff thereon alleged that “Since resigning from MPPD on July 20, 2020, Officer Miller has applied to law enforcement positions with no fewer than five (5) law enforcement departments. To date and despite Officer Miller’s 20+ years of law enforcement service and low recruitment numbers nationwide, Officer Miller has not received a single offer of employment.” And that “Officer Miller’s inability to find work in law enforcement is a direct and proximate result of the meritless Criminal Complaint, administrative investigations, and obstruction by the Defendants.”

 

The Plaintiff went on to allege that “Since his wrongful termination, Officer Miller has lost no less than $88,276.25 in salary, $670,927.80 in retirement benefits, and $191,058.96 in Hazard Pay.” And that “To defend against the wrongful Criminal Complaint filed by the Defendants, Officer Miller accrued attorneys’ fees in an amount not less than $30,000.00.” Also that, “Officer Miller has also accrued and will continue to accrue medical fees in an amount of not less than $10,000.00 to treat medical conditions caused by Defendants actions.”

 

There are eight claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff against all Defendants for the alleged malicious prosecution, abuse of process, common law civil conspiracy, intentional infliction of emotional distress, statutory business conspiracy VA. Code §§ 18.2-499 and 18.2-500, conspiracy to interfere with civil rights pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1985, violation of 4th amendment for illegal search and seizure and alleged violation of 14th amendment, respectively.

 

In his prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the court to pass a judgment for compensatory damages, in an amount of no less than $990,263.01, treble damages pursuant to VA. CODE § 18.2-500, in an amount no less than $2,970,789.03, punitive damages in the amount of no less than $2,500,000.00, along with all direct and consequential damages, attorneys’ fee, cost of action and such other reliefs as the court may deem fit.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00456

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

Referral Judges

Michael S. Nachmanoff

Ivan D. Davis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Regan Miller

Defendants

Laszlo Palko

Frank Winston

Carl Dorr

City of Manassas Park

Mario Lugo

Trevor Reinhart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Joseph Smith

Attorney at Berenzweig Leonard LLP

8300 Greensboro Drive, Suite 1250

Mclean, VA 22102

Clyde Elbert Findley

Attorney at Berenzweig Leonard LLP

8300 Greensboro Dr, Suite 1250

Mclean, VA 22102

Defendant Attorneys

Heather Kathleen Bardot

Attorney at McGavin, Boyce, Bardot, Thorsen & Katz, P.C.

9990 Fairfax Boulevard, Suite 400

Fairfax, VA 20109

Nicole Lee Antolic

Attorney at London Amburn

607 Market Street, Suite 900

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

#99

(#99) Letter to Judge Leonie M. Brinkema re Amended Complaint. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

98 #2

Exhibit 45

98 #1

Exhibit 44

#98

(#98) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mario Lugo, Trevor Reinhart, filed by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 44, #2 Exhibit 45)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#97

(#97) ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 87] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and it is hereby ORDERED that Counts IV, VII, and VIII be and are dismissed from this civil action, along with defendants Carl Dorr, Frank Winston, and Laszlo Palko; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff file an amended complaint as to Count I within seven days which describes the correct code section forming the basis of his malicious prosecution. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/22. (yguy) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#96

(#96) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2022. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status. Defts #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment is argued and GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (order to follow) (Court Reporter S. Austin.)(yguy) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#95

(#95) ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED; and further ORDERS that Plaintiff Regan Miller's Sur-Reply attached to the Motion shall be deemed filed as of this date. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/9/2022. (shea) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

87 #1

Proposed Order

#87

(#91) RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

1 #28

Exhibit 28

1 #27

Exhibit 27

1 #26

Exhibit 26

1 #25

Exhibit 25

1 #24

Exhibit 24

1 #23

Exhibit 23

1 #22

Exhibit 22

1 #21

Exhibit 21

1 #20

Exhibit 20

262 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Letter to Judge Leonie M. Brinkema re Amended Complaint. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mario Lugo, Trevor Reinhart, filed by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 44, #2 Exhibit 45)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. No. 87] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; and it is hereby ORDERED that Counts IV, VII, and VIII be and are dismissed from this civil action, along with defendants Carl Dorr, Frank Winston, and Laszlo Palko; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff file an amended complaint as to Count I within seven days which describes the correct code section forming the basis of his malicious prosecution. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/18/22. (yguy) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2022. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status. Defts #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment is argued and GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (order to follow) (Court Reporter S. Austin.)(yguy) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) ORDERS that the Motion is GRANTED; and further ORDERS that Plaintiff Regan Miller's Sur-Reply attached to the Motion shall be deemed filed as of this date. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/9/2022. (shea) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sur-Reply)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) REPLY to Response to Motion re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit)(Bardot, Heather) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #91 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Notice of Hearing Date March 18, 2022 re #91 Response in Opposition to Motion, #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to City of Manassas Park, Carl Dorr, Mario Lugo, Laszlo Palko, Trevor Reinhart, Frank Winston. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons to Laszlo Palko by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons to Carl Dorr by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons to Trevor Reinhart by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons to Frank Winston by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons to Mario Lugo by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons to City of Manassas Park by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Regan Miller. (Findley, Clyde) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with Jury Demand against City of Manassas Park, et al. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7724800.), filed by Regan Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Exhibit 03, #4 Exhibit 04, #5 Exhibit 05, #6 Exhibit 06, #7 Exhibit 07, #8 Exhibit 08, #9 Exhibit 09, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Findley, Clyde) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (klau, ). (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clyde Elbert Findley