This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2019 at 07:47:51 (UTC).

Miller v. Chase Bank USA, National Association et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Miller filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Chase Bank USA, National Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01503

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Paul A. Miller

Paula A. Miller

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Chase Bank USA, National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antranig N. Garibian

Attorney at Garibian Law Offices, P.C.

1010 Bancroft Parkway, Suite 22

Wilmington, DE 19805

Defendant Attorneys

Karen M. Grivner

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 710

Wilmington, DE 19801

Blake A. Bennett

Attorney at Cooch and Taylor

The Brandywine Building, 1000 N. West Street, 10Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Terri R. Brown

Heather M. Shumaker

Travis Steven Hunter

Attorney at Richards, Layton & Finger, PA

One Rodney Square, Suite 600, 920 N. King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Kevin Grant Collins

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

1000 N. West Street, Suite 1500

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent experian, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantagescore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC Only by Paula A. Miller (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #17 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to November 4, 2019 filed by Chase Bank USA, National Association. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Chase Bank USA, National Association answer due 11/4/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2019. (fms) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer to Complaint to November 4, 2019 - filed by Chase Bank USA, National Association. (Collins, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED, re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Conor M. Reardon filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/2/2019. (fms) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Conor M. Reardon - filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Hunter, Travis) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union, LLC Only by Paula A. Miller (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Vice Admission of Heather M. Shumaker by Trans Union, LLC (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Terri R. Brown for Trans Union, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d), Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heather M. Shumaker - filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Bennett, Blake) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula A. Miller. Trans Union, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula A. Miller. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula A. Miller. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula A. Miller. Chase Bank USA, National Association served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmg) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Chase Bank USA, National Association on 8/12/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 8/12/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 8/12/2019; Trans Union, LLC on 8/12/2019. Summons mailed to requesting party's Philadelphia Office. (kmd) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Chase Bank USA, National Association, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2706100.) - filed by Paul A. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chase Bank USA NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant