This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:27:47 (UTC).

MILLER v. BRYANT

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Civil Right - Other Civil Right case was filed by MILLER against BRYANT in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03599

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARISSE MILLER

Defendant

CUBA BRYANT

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address for CHARISSE MILLER. (JDH) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER - The Court GRANTS Ms. Miller's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Ms. Miller's Complaint for failure to properly invoke this Court's jurisdiction and for failure to allege any discernable claim. The Court ORDERS that Ms. Miller may, if supported by a reasonable factual and legal basis, file an amended complaint on or before September 27, 2019 that addresses the issues outlined above. The failure to file an amended complaint by that date will result in dismissal of this action for lack of jurisdiction. Should the amended complaint properly invoke this Court's jurisdiction, it will then be subject to screening for legal sufficiency. (See Order). Copy to Charisse Miller via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/29/2019. (JDH) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CUBA BRYANT, filed by CHARISSE MILLER. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #3 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to CHARISSE MILLER at 3390 N. Franklin Road, Indianapolis, IN 46227. (JDH) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CHARISSE MILLER. (REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Change of Address for CHARISSE MILLER. (JDH) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #3 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction sent to CHARISSE MILLER at 3390 N. Franklin Road, Indianapolis, IN 46227. (JDH) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER - The Court GRANTS Ms. Miller's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 and DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Ms. Miller's Complaint for failure to properly invoke this Court's jurisdiction and for failure to allege any discernable claim. The Court ORDERS that Ms. Miller may, if supported by a reasonable factual and legal basis, file an amended complaint on or before September 27, 2019 that addresses the issues outlined above. The failure to file an amended complaint by that date will result in dismissal of this action for lack of jurisdiction. Should the amended complaint properly invoke this Court's jurisdiction, it will then be subject to screening for legal sufficiency. (See Order). Copy to Charisse Miller via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/29/2019. (JDH) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff CHARISSE MILLER. (REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CUBA BRYANT, filed by CHARISSE MILLER. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.