This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 09:43:23 (UTC).

Miller v. BHC Pinnacle Pointe Hospital LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 Miller filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against BHC Pinnacle Pointe Hospital LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Billy Roy Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01137

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Billy Roy Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sidney Miller

Defendant

BHC Pinnacle Pointe Hospital LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm, PLLC

Kirkpatrick Plaza, Suite 510, 10800 Financial Centre Parkway

Little Rock, AR 72211

Lydia Hicks Hamlet

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm, PLLC

Kirkpatrick Plaza, Suite 510, 10800 Financial Centre Parkway

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorney

Nicole Susanne LeFave

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

100 Congress, Suite 1400

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Miller. BHC Pinnacle Pointe Hospital LLC served on 12/1/2021. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Document Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Dismiss. The Joint Motion to Dismiss is granted and this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/22/21. (mmb) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by BHC Pinnacle Pointe Hospital LLC (Attachments: #1 Document Proposed Order)(LeFave, Nicole) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Miller. BHC Pinnacle Pointe Hospital LLC served on 12/1/2021. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against BHC Pinnacle Pointe Hospital LLC filed by Sidney Miller. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT084554.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Susanne LeFave